Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael M Mihm
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 1:13-cv-01271
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2013
Terminated:Dec 16, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jan 03, 2015 10:47 AM CST
Defendant
City of Bloomington
Represented By
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Defendant
Randy McKinley
Defendant
Robert Siron
Defendant
Lt. Tim Stanesa
Represented By
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Defendant
Robert J Wall
Represented By
Peter R Jennetten
Quinn Johnston Henderson Pretorius & Cerulo
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Ward
Represented By
Dawn L Wall
Costigan & Wollrab
contact info

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
misc Remark Tue 12/03 3:37 PM
Remark: Exhibits previously held in the Peoria Clerks Office vault have been destroyed. (RK)
Related: [-]