Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Jeanne J Graham
Case #: 0:13-cv-01492
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2013
Terminated:Sep 20, 2013
Last checked: Saturday Jan 03, 2015 7:21 AM CST
Defendant
Landesk Software, Inc.
Represented By
Terrence J Fleming
Lindquist & Vennum Pllp
contact info
Bonnie Jarrett
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Sharda R Kneen
Lindquist & Vennum Pllp
contact info
Dale M Cendali
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Shavlik
Represented By
Daniel W McDonald
Merchant & Gould PC
contact info
Eric R Chad
Merchant & Gould PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/24/2013 11:19 PM CDT
Wednesday, June 19, 2013
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Jeanne J. Graham. Please use case number 13cv1492 (PJS/JJG). (jz)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Landesk Software, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0864-3597381.) Filed by Mark Shavlik. Filer requests summons issued. (McDonald, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 Summons Issued as to Landesk Software, Inc. (jz)
Related: [-]