California Central District Court
Judge:George H King
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:13-cv-04460
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2013
Terminated:Aug 31, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 1:51 PM PST
Defendant
Summy-Birchard Inc
Represented By
Glenn D Pomerantz
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Melinda E LeMoine
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Adam I Kaplan
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Kelly M Klaus
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Warner Chappell Music Inc
Represented By
Glenn D Pomerantz
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Melinda E LeMoine
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Adam I Kaplan
Munger Tolles & Olson LLP
contact info
Kelly M Klaus
Munger Tolles And Olson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Good Morning to You Productions Corp
Represented By
Marisa C Livesay
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
William R Hill
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Beth A Landes
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Andrew Scott MacKay
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Omel Andres Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Daniel J Schacht
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Katherine J Odenbreit
Odenbreit Law, Apc
contact info
Betsy C Manifold
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Mark C Rifkin
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Tina B Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Rachele R Rickert
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Francis M Gregorek
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alison C Gibbs
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling & Mah Inc
contact info
Janine L Pollack
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Majar Productions LLC
Represented By
Rachele R Rickert
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Lionel Zevi Glancy
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Francis M Gregorek
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Kara M Wolke
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Marisa C Livesay
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Marc L Godino
Glancy Binkow And Goldberg LLP
contact info
Betsy C Manifold
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Rupa Marya
Represented By
Marisa C Livesay
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
William R Hill
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Beth A Landes
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Andrew Scott MacKay
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Omel Andres Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Daniel J Schacht
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Katherine J Odenbreit
Odenbreit Law, Apc
contact info
Betsy C Manifold
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Mark C Rifkin
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Tina B Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Rachele R Rickert
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Randall Scott Newman
Randall S Newman PC
contact info
Francis M Gregorek
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alison C Gibbs
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling & Mah Inc
contact info
Janine L Pollack
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Siegel
Represented By
Marisa C Livesay
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
William R Hill
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Beth A Landes
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Andrew Scott MacKay
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Omel Andres Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Daniel J Schacht
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Katherine J Odenbreit
Odenbreit Law, Apc
contact info
Betsy C Manifold
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Mark C Rifkin
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Tina B Nieves
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling And Mah Inc
contact info
Rachele R Rickert
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Randall Scott Newman
Randall S Newman PC
contact info
Francis M Gregorek
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Alison C Gibbs
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Lubka Darling & Mah Inc
contact info
Janine L Pollack
Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman And Herz LLP
contact info
Kathlynn Elizabeth Smith
Hunt Ortmann Palffy Nieves Darling And Mah Inc
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
375 375 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Wed 08/31 4:58 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
374 374 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 08/31 4:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS REOPENING/CLOSING by Judge George H. King: Case should have been closed on entry dated 6/30/16. JS-6 (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
373 373 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 08/26 11:58 AM
[REDACTED] RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT REGARDING CLASS COUNSEL'S BILLING RECORDS filed by Plaintiffs. Filed Pursuant to Dkt.372 (pso)
Related: [-]
372 372 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 08/25 4:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re: Sealing Plaintiffs' Unredacted Response Brief (Dkt. 364) by Judge George H. King: On August 16, 2016, we ordered Plaintiffs to state whether their unredacted response brief regarding class counsel's billing records should be filed under seal and, if so, to provide a redacted version of the brief to be filed publicly. (See Dkt. 369.) Plaintiffs request that their unredacted response be filed under seal and have provided a redacted version. (Dkt. 371.) We DIRECT the clerk to seal the unredacted response, (Dkt. 364), and to file Plaintiffs' redacted version, (Dkt. 371, Ex. A), publicly. (bm)
Related: [-]