Member Case
Lead case is: 1:13-bk-44106

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth S Stong
Case #: 1:13-bk-44107
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2013
Terminated:Sep 19, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Mar 14, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. AssetsMore than $1 billion
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cengage Learning Acquisitions, Inc.
200 Stamford Pl Fl 4
Stamford, CT 06902-6753
Represented By
Jonathan Henes
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
271 Cadman Plaza East Suite 4529
Brooklyn, NY 11201


Docket last updated: 09/19/2016 6:01 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2013
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1 13-44107 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 11435379. Fee amount 1213.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Related to cases: 13-44105 13-44106 and 13-44108 (nds)
Related: [-]
Judge Nancy Hershey Lord removed from the case due to Related Case, Judge Reassigned. Judge Elizabeth Stong added to the case. (nds)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1213 Filed by Jonathan Henes on behalf of Cengage Learning Acquisitions, Inc. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/30/2013. Disclosure Statement due by 10/30/2013. (Henes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion for Joint Administration of Case 13-44107 with Case(s) 13-44105 13-44106 13-44107 13-44108 /Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Joint Administration of Their Related Chapter 11 Cases Filed by Jonathan Henes on behalf of Cengage Learning Acquisitions, Inc.. (Henes, Jonathan)
Related: [-]