Member Case
Lead case is: 5:13-bk-52062

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Lafferty
Case #: 5:13-bk-53607
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Sep 11, 2013
Claims Deadline:Nov 05, 2013
Terminated:Jan 18, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tarsin, Inc.
916 Southwood Blvd Ste 3 Ste A
Incline Village, NV 89451-9496
Represented By
Michael W. Malter
Law Offices Of Binder And Malter
contact info
Julie H. Rome-Banks
Law Offices Of Binder And Malter
contact info
Last checked: never
Responsible Ind
Michael Ghiselli
386 Donald Drive
Moraga, CA 94556
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 07/01/2013 5:00 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 02, 2013
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 08/07/2013 at 10:30 AM at San Jose Room 268. Proof of Claim due by 11/05/2013. (Malter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-53607 [misc,volp11] (1213.00). Receipt number 20306541, amount $1213.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
1 1 19 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition, Fee Amount $1213, Filed by Tarsin, Inc.. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 07/9/2013.Incomplete Filings due by 07/16/2013. CORRECTIVE ENTRY: COURT TERMINATED SECTION 521 FROM DOCKET TEXT. (Malter, Michael) Modified on 7/3/2013 (lub).
Related: [-]
2 2 Notice of Related Bankruptcy Case: 13-52062 (Game2Mobile, Inc.) . Filed by Debtor Tarsin, Inc. (Rome-Banks, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
3 3 Application to Designate Michael Ghiselli, Director as Responsible Individual Filed by Debtor Tarsin, Inc. (Rome-Banks, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service