Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Charles P Kocoras
Referred: Mary M Rowland
Case #: 1:13-cv-05014
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2013
Terminated:Sep 18, 2014
Last checked: Friday Jan 02, 2015 4:27 AM CST
Defendant
J. Dennis Hastert
Represented By
Ethan Allen Hastert
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Justin A. Chiarodo
Dickstein Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
J. David John
Represented By
John Joseph Muldoon, III
Muldoon & Muldoon LLC
contact info
Michael Kevin Goldberg
Goldberg Law Group, LLC
contact info

GPO Sep 18 2014
MEMORANDUM Opinion Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/18/2014.Mailed notice(vcf, )
GPO Mar 04 2015
MEMORANDUM Opinion: J. Dennis Hastert's motion to dismiss Realtor's amended complaint 38 is granted. In court ruling set for 3/5/2015 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/4/2015. Mailed notice(vcf, )
GPO Apr 06 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion: The Court finds that Mr. J. David John was not and is not an original source of information as to former Speaker J. Dennis Hastert with regard to receipt of federal funds for an office and related items and there use for private business purposes. The Second Amended Complaint reflecting J. David John as Relator/Plaintiff and J. Dennis Hastert as Defendant is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/6/2017. Mailed notice(vcf, )

1. Judge dismisses lawsuit against former Speaker Dennis Hastert (chicago.cbslocal.com)
Submitted Fri 04/07/2017
Docket last updated: 02/13/2019 5:01 PM CST
Friday, July 12, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by J. David John. (tlm)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (tlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 PROOF of Service by J. David John.1 (tlm)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff J. David John by Michael Kevin Goldberg. (tlm)
Related: [-]