JoAnne's Bed & Back Stores, Inc.
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Thomas J Catliota |
Case #: | 0:08-bk-14606 |
Case Filed: | Apr 02, 2008 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 12, 2008 |
Terminated: | Dec 30, 2011 |
Plan Confirmed: | Nov 04, 2008 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jul 11, 2008 |
Debtor
JoAnne's Bed & Back Stores, Inc.
11714 Baltimore Ave
Beltsville, MD 20705-1850 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt, 11
US Trustee - Greenbelt 6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Sunday, January 01, 2012 | ||
395 | 395 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 333. Notice Date 01/01/2012. (Admin.) | |
Friday, December 30, 2011 | ||
394 | 394 Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case. (Alexander, Lisa) | |
Tuesday, December 27, 2011 | ||
Adversary Case 0:10-ap-199 Closed. (Alexander, Lisa) |