New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul G Gardephe
Case #: 1:13-cv-05031
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2013
Terminated:Mar 11, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 12:34 PM EST
Defendant
Atlantic Recording Corporation,
Represented By
Laura Sack
Davis, Wright, Tremaine, LLP
contact info
Lyle Stewart Zuckerman
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Michael John Goettig
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Warner Music Group Corp.
Represented By
Laura Sack
Davis, Wright, Tremaine, LLP
contact info
Lyle Stewart Zuckerman
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Michael John Goettig
Davis Wright Tremaine Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Henry
Represented By
Lloyd Robert Ambinder
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Suzanne Brooke Leeds
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
Kara Sue Miller
Virgina & Ambinder, LLP
contact info
James Emmet Murphy
Virginia & Ambinder, LLP
contact info


1. Warner to settle unpaid intern litigation in the US | Complete Music Update (completemusicupdate.com)
Submitted Mon 02/02/2015
Docket last updated: 03/12/2016 12:13 AM EST
Friday, July 19, 2013
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 13-cv-4449. (mn)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (mn)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155527/2013. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401072450).Document filed by Warner Music Group Corp., Atlantic Recording Corporation,.(mn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a