Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 6:12-cv-00855
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2012
Re-opened:Feb 18, 2020
Terminated:Jan 06, 2021
Case in other court:FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 19-01050 FEDERAL CIRCUIT, 21-01672
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2016 8:04 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Jeanne M Heffernan
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Matthew Richard Rodgers
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Danny Lloyd Williams
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
David Nelson Draper
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Eric M. Albritton
Albritton Law Firm
contact info
Leslie Marie Schmidt
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Akshay S Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Diwei Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Mangesh A Kulkarni
Kirkland & Ellis - San Francisco
contact info
Kyung Tai Kim
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Michael E Jones
Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Shawn A. Latchford
Albritton Law Firm
contact info
Ruben Singh Bains
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Robert A Appleby
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Gregory S Arovas
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Allen Franklin Gardner
Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Lauren B Sabol
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Brian K Buss
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Christopher Needham Cravey
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Terry D Morgan
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Joseph Allen Loy
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Science Applications International Corporation
Represented By
Arturo Padilla
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Andy Tindel
Attorney & Counsel At Law, P.C.
contact info
Donald Urrabazo
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Ronald Wielkopolski
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Joon Song
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
VirnetX Inc.
Represented By
Charles Ainsworth
Parker Bunt & Ainsworth
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Ryan Abbott Hargrave
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Robert M Parker
Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Mitchell Reed Sibley
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Stacie Greskowiak McNulty
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info
Samuel Franklin Baxter
Mckool Smith - Marshall
contact info
Douglas A Cawley
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Robert Christopher Bunt
Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Jeanne M Heffernan
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Matthew Richard Rodgers
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Danny Lloyd Williams
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
David Nelson Draper
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Steve Papazian
Kirkland & Ellis - Los Angeles
contact info
Mangesh A Kulkarni
Kirkland & Ellis - San Francisco
contact info
Michael E Jones
Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation
contact info
John M Desmarais
Desmarais Llp - New York
contact info
Robert A Appleby
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Brian K Buss
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Terry D Morgan
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Joseph Allen Loy
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
John C O'Quinn
Kirkland & Ellis - Washington
contact info
Eric M. Albritton
Albritton Law Firm
contact info
F Christopher Mizzo
Kirkland & Ellis - Washington
contact info
Dominic E Massa
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Leslie Marie Schmidt
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Elizabeth Reilly
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Akshay S Deoras
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Diwei Zhang
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Kyung Tai Kim
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Shawn A. Latchford
Albritton Law Firm
contact info
Ruben Singh Bains
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Gregory S Arovas
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Allen Franklin Gardner
Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Lauren B Sabol
Kirkland & Ellis, Llp - Nyc
contact info
Rebecca A Bact
Wilmer Hale - Boston
contact info
John Frederick Bufe
Potter Minton, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Christopher Needham Cravey
Williams Morgan, PC
contact info
Mediator
Honorable Robert Faulkner
JAMS 8401 North Central Expressway Suite 610
Dallas, TX 75225
Represented By
Robert W Faulkner
Jams Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Science Applications International Corporation
Represented By
Arturo Padilla
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Andy Tindel
Attorney & Counsel At Law, P.C.
contact info
Donald Urrabazo
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Ronald Wielkopolski
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Joon Song
Urrabazo Law, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
VirnetX Inc.
Represented By
Charles Ainsworth
Parker Bunt & Ainsworth
contact info
Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Ryan Abbott Hargrave
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Daniel R Pearson
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Christopher S Stewart
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Austin Curry
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Hamad M Hamad
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Robert M Parker
Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.
contact info
Jason Dodd Cassady
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Justin Thomas Nemunaitis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
John Franklin Summers
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Mitchell Reed Sibley
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Stacie Greskowiak McNulty
Mckool Smith Pc - Dallas
contact info
Samuel Franklin Baxter
Mckool Smith - Marshall
contact info
Douglas A Cawley
Mckool Smith - Dallas
contact info
Jason Scott McManis
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Claire Abernathy Henry
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Thomas John Ward, Jr
Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC
contact info
Robert Christopher Bunt
Parker, Bunt & Ainsworth, P.C.
contact info
Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Caldwell Cassady & Curry, PC
contact info
Technical Advisor
Michael T McLemore
10333 Richmond Ave, Ste 1100
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Michael Thomas McLemore
Law Office Of Michael T. Mclemore
contact info

GPO Aug 08 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. The Court DENIES Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness 148. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/08/14. (mll, )
GPO Mar 22 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION RE 362 ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/22/16. (mll, )
GPO Jan 12 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION detailing the reasons for denying Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay 518. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/12/18. (mjc, )

1. FaceTime, iMessages hang in the balance after Apple loss to patent troll (arstechnica.com)
Submitted Fri 05/27/2016
2. Apple Ordered To Pay $625M To Patent Troll In FaceTime Lawsuit (social.techcrunch.com)
Submitted Thu 02/04/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 31, 2024
1067 1067 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/31 3:19 PM
ORDER granting1066 Motion to Modify Protective Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/31/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1066 1066 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/28 7:00 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Modify the Agreed Protective Order by Apple Inc..(Schmidt, Leslie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - MPH Motion to Compel,
Att: 2 Proposed Order