Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:13-bk-31783
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2013
Dismissed:Jan 08, 2014
Terminated:Jan 13, 2014

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
2625 North Clark Street, LLC
111 W Maple St Apt 3302
Chicago, IL 60610-5411
Represented By
O Allan Fridman
Law Office Of O. Allan Fridman
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 08/09/2013 2:12 PM CDT
Thursday, August 08, 2013
1 1 11 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fee Amount $1213, Filed by O Allan Fridman on behalf of 2625 North Clark Street, LLC (Fridman, O Allan)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 13-31783 [misc,volp11a] (1213.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 24191425. Fee Amount $1213.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing of Petition and Accompanying Documents. Filed by O Allan Fridman on behalf of 2625 North Clark Street, LLC. (Fridman, O Allan)
Related: [-]