Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Joy Flowers Conti
Case #: 2:12-cv-01641
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2012
Terminated:Feb 27, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Mar 12, 2015 7:28 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By
Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
White & Case LLP
contact info
Samuel W. Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Bijal Vakil
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ralph G. Fischer
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
White & Case LLP
contact info
Lionel M. Lavenue
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Samuel W. Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Bijal Vakil
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ralph G. Fischer
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By
Sam Kim
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Matthew Douglas Powers
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Palani Rathinasamy
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Philip W. Marsh
Agility Ip Law, LLP
contact info
Robert L. Gerrity
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
William P. Nelson
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Steven Scott Cherensky
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Paul T. Ehrlich
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Bryan A. Loose
Leland Schermer & Associates
contact info
Stefani C. Smith
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Michael Duy Khiem Nguyen
Agility Ip Law, Llp - Menlo Park
contact info
Andrew W. Spangler
Spangler & Fussell P.C.
contact info
James C. Otteson
Agility Ip Law, LLP
contact info
Philip William Marsh
Agility Ip Law, Llp - Menlo Park
contact info
Aaron M. Nathan
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Leland P. Schermer
Leland Schermer & Associates
contact info
Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By
Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
White & Case LLP
contact info
Lionel M. Lavenue
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Samuel W. Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Bijal Vakil
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ralph G. Fischer
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By
Shamita D. Etienne-Cummings
White & Case LLP
contact info
Lionel M. Lavenue
Finnegan Henderson Farabow Garrett & Dunner, LLP
contact info
Samuel W. Braver
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Bijal Vakil
White & Case LLP
contact info
Ralph G. Fischer
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Interested Party
APPLE INC.
Interested Party
BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY
Represented By
Leslie M. Spencer
Ropes & Gray LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By
Sam Kim
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Matthew Douglas Powers
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Palani Rathinasamy
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Philip W. Marsh
Agility Ip Law, LLP
contact info
Robert L. Gerrity
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
William P. Nelson
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Steven Scott Cherensky
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Paul T. Ehrlich
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Bryan A. Loose
Leland Schermer & Associates
contact info
Stefani C. Smith
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
James A Fussell, III
Spangler & Fussell PC
contact info
Michael Duy Khiem Nguyen
Agility Ip Law, Llp - Menlo Park
contact info
Andrew W. Spangler
Spangler & Fussell P.C.
contact info
James C. Otteson
Agility Ip Law, LLP
contact info
Philip William Marsh
Agility Ip Law, Llp - Menlo Park
contact info
Aaron M. Nathan
Tensegrity Law Group, LLP
contact info
Leland P. Schermer
Leland Schermer & Associates
contact info
Special Master
TINA O. MILLER
Represented By
Tina O. Miller
Farrell & Reisinger
contact info

GPO May 08 2013
ORDER re 38 Joinder, filed by JPMORGAN CHASE & CO., JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. As set forth in the accompanying memorandum opinion and order, the motion by certain opposing parties seeking to preclude indirect infringement, representativeness, and doctrine of equivalents contentions under Maxim's Local Patent Rule disclosures, (Misc. No. 12-244, ECF No. 525), is DENIED. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 5/8/2013. (dmm)

Docket last updated: 02/27/2013 10:33 PM EST
Monday, October 01, 2012
***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR BY CLERK*** Case ASSIGNED to Judge Richard A. Schell. (baf, ) Modified on 10/1/2012 (baf, ).
Related: [-]
Case ASSIGNED to Judge Ron Clark. (baf, )
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Amos L. Mazzant pursuant to a Standing Order. (baf, )
Related: [-]
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3807210.), filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc..(Spangler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,940,510,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 5,949,880,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,105,013,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 6,237,095,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. (Spangler, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. (Fussell, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Issued as to JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (baf, )
Related: [-]
6 6 SUMMONS Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 24, 2012
7 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..( Fussell, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2012
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for All Defendants. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( pad, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 06, 2012
Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Pennsylvania. (baf, )
Related: [-]
8 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) - Transferring case to the Western District of Pennsylvania, with consent of that Court, assigned to the Honorable Nora Barry Fischer. (baf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 08, 2012
ORDER indicating that it is hereby ordered that the admission requirements in MDL No. 2354 are as follows: As to Case Number 12-89, originally filed in Pittsburgh, PA, an attorney must either be generally admitted or admitted pro hac vice. All motions for pro hac vice as to Case Number 12-89 must be filed in Case Number 12-89 and, if the motion is granted, then appearances can be entered at Master Docket 12-mc-244 (a separate motion for pro hac vice is not required to be filed at 12-mc-244). All of the cases transferred by the MDL Panel shall have no admission requirements in the Western District of PA. However, all attorneys shall enter their appearances in both the appropriate transferred cases and at the Master Docket at 12-mc-144 and said attorneys must be ECF registered. Ordered by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/7/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
Related: [-]
ORDER indicating that counsel are advised to refer to the docket MC No. 12-244 to determine the current status of the lead case of this Multi-District Litigation ("MDL") matter in the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Counsel are also advised to review the Court's Order to facilitate the Court's resolution of cases relating to this Multi-District Litigation ("MDL") matter entered at Document No. 6 at MC No.12-244 (which, among other things, describes proper filing procedures in detail). Ordered by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 11/8/12. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg)
Related: [-]
9 9 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 4:12-cv-00619. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leland P. Schermer on behalf of MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.. (Schermer, Leland)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan A. Loose on behalf of MAXIM INTEGRATED PRODUCTS, INC.. (Loose, Bryan)
Related: [-]