California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 3:12-cv-05756
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2012
Terminated:Dec 05, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Mar 12, 2015 4:07 AM PDT
Defendant
Genji Retail Support, Inc
Represented By
Marlene S. Muraco
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Elisa Nadeau
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Genji, Inc
Represented By
Marlene S. Muraco
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Elisa Nadeau
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Defendant
Genji, LLC
Represented By
Marlene S. Muraco
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Elisa Nadeau
Littler Mendelson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tju Tjin Liem
Represented By
David S. Harris
North Bay Law Group
contact info
Alan Dale Harris
Harris & Ruble
contact info
Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Nen Thio
Represented By
David S. Harris
North Bay Law Group
contact info
Alan Dale Harris
Harris & Ruble
contact info
Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Denny Wijaya
Represented By
David S. Harris
North Bay Law Group
contact info
Alan Dale Harris
Harris & Ruble
contact info
Abigail Ameri Zelenski
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info

GPO Apr 19 2013
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 24. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/19/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
GPO Jul 23 2013
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION 27. Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2013 is VACATED. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement by 8/28/2013, set for hearing 10/2/2013 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/23/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
GPO Aug 07 2014
en Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2014)Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 37 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The Court will hold a final approval hearing on December 3, 2014, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, U.S. District Court, 450 Gold
GPO Aug 26 2014
udge Nathanael Cousins on 8/26/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)ORDER RE PROPOSED ORDER. By August 26, 2014, at 3:00 p.m. Plaintiffs must file a copy of the proposed revised class notice and claim form highlighting all the changes made to the class notice and claim form approved by the Court. Signed by J


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.