New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela K Chen
Referred: Ramon E Reyes, Jr
Case #: 1:12-cv-05565
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 09, 2012
Terminated:Mar 27, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 07, 2016 6:00 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Vannguard Urban Improvement Association, Inc.
Represented By
Andre Ramon Soleil
Soleil, Onua & Associates, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Sonya Coley
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Defendant
1659 Hancock General Partners Corp.
516 Macdonough Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Defendant
1661 Macon General Partners Corp.
516 Macdonough Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Defendant
1686 Gates General Partners Corp.
516 Macdonough Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Defendant
Vannguard Urban Improvement Association, Inc.
Represented By
Andre Ramon Soleil
Soleil, Onua & Associates, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vannguard Local Development Corporation, Inc.
516 Macdonough Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Represented By
Andre Ramon Soleil
Soleil, Onua & Associates, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Arthur H. Niles
516 MacDonough Street, Apt.# 1
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Represented By
Nnenna Onua
Mckinley Onua & Associates
contact info
Marsha A. Douglas
Mckinley Onua & Association
contact info
Defendant
Malcolm 1677 General Partners Corp.
516 Macdonough Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Interested Party
Karen Sherman
Represented By
Scott S. Greenspun
Braverman Greenspun, P.C.
contact info
Lauren T Piechocki
Braverman Greenspun, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Wright
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Salika Taylor
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Mossa Jones
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruth Richardson
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Pope
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonya Johnson
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Ebony Hall
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonya Coley
Represented By
Irene Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
Irene Donna Thomas
Thomas & Associates
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Annunciate Hopkins Pope
Terminated: 08/21/2013
individually and as Treasurer of the Board of Directors 378 Chauncey Street
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Represented By
Ronald Barry Weisenberg
Law Office Of Ronald B. Weisenberg
contact info
Defendant
Thomas C. Hansard, Jr.
Terminated: 09/26/2014
individually and as Chairman of the Board of Directors 332 Jefferson Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11216
Represented By
Franklin N. Meyer
contact info
Defendant
Bakbakkar Harris
Terminated: 07/31/2013
Represented By
Donnell Ehren Suares
Suares & Associates
contact info

GPO Sep 24 2014
ORDER granting 87 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendant Hansard's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against him, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), is granted. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed as to Hansard for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Clerk of Court respectfully is directed to terminate Defendant Hansard from this matter. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 9/24/2014. (Doerr, Mark)
GPO Aug 05 2016
ORDER granting 145 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 178 Motion for Default Judgment: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motions for default judgment against Defendants Vannguard, Local, and the Partnership Corporations and deems them jointly and severally liable for the FLSA and NYLL violations alleged in Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. However, the Court reserves any damages inquest, pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2), as to these defaulting Defendants, pending resolution of the liability of the non-defaulting Defendant, Arthur Niles. Should Niles also be deemed liable, the Court shall consolidate the damages inquest as to the defaulting Defendants into any damages determination, at trial or otherwise, as to Niles. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/5/2016. (Levanon, Neta)
GPO Dec 13 2016
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons in the attached, Plaintiffs' 160 motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. However, the Court orders the remaining assets of the Vannguard Entities RESTRAINED pursuant to CPLR § 5229. The Court further orders attachment pursuant to CPLR § 6201(3) of: (i) all of Defendant Niles's assets; (ii) all money transferred from any Defendant to Thomas Hansard, Jr. after the filing of this lawsuit; (iii) all money transferred from any Defendant to C & L Boiler Corp. after the filing of this lawsuit; and (iv) all money transferred from any Defendant to Andre Soleil after the filing of this lawsuit. The Court attaches these assets pending proof from these persons and entities, which shall be submitted within forty-five (45) days, that the money was transferred to them for legitimate purposes or to pay for services rendered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 12/13/2016. (Gregorio, Heather)
GPO Mar 27 2018
ORDER granting 269 Motion for Default Judgment: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for a default judgment against Defendant Niles and dismisses Defendants' counterclaims against Sonya Coley. The Court previously granted Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Defendants Vannguard, Local, and the Partnership Corporations. Based, in part, on its prior ruling 220 the Court finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to recover damages under the FLSA and NYLL against Defendants. The Court has consolidated the damages inquest as to Defendants and finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to a total damages amount of $929,973.07, as to which Defendants are jointly and severally liable. Judgment is granted in Plaintiffs favor, and this matter is hereby terminated. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/27/2018. (Rediker, Ezekiel)
GPO Mar 29 2018
AMENDED ORDER granting 269 Motion for Default Judgment: The Court grants Plaintiffs' motion for a default judgment against Defendant Niles and dismisses Defendants' counterclaims against Sonya Coley. The Court previously granted Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Defendants Vannguard, Local, and the Partnership Corporations. Based, in part, on its prior ruling 220 the Court finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to recover damages under the FLSA and NYLL against Defendants. The Court has consolidated the damages inquest as to Defendants and finds that Plaintiffs are entitled to a total damages amount of $929,973.07, as to which Defendants are jointly and severally liable. Judgment is granted in Plaintiffs' favor, and this matter is hereby terminated. Amended to reflect a change on page 24 regarding the New York Legislature's passage of a bill concerning the amount a plaintiff can recover under the NYLL. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 3/29/2018. (Rediker, Ezekiel)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.