North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Graham Mullen
Case #: 3:13-cv-00464
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2013
Terminated:Aug 13, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 7:09 AM EST
Appellant
Legal Newsline
Represented By
Alan W. Duncan
Smith Moore LLP
contact info
Steven Pflaum
Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Andrew May
Neal, Gerber & Eisenberg LLP
contact info
Stephen M. Russell, Jr.
Van Laningham Duncan PLLC
contact info
Appellee
Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC
Represented By
Garland Stuart Cassada
contact info
Shelley Koon Abel
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham
contact info
Ashley Kerns Neal
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.
contact info
Richard C. Worf
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson
contact info
Albert Franklin Durham
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.
contact info
John R. Miller, Jr.
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.
contact info
William Samuel Smoak, Jr.
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.
contact info
Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Jonathan C. Krisko
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Ross Robert Fulton
Rayburn, Cooper & Durham, P.A.
contact info
Louis Adams Bledsoe, III
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Appellee
Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants
Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC 227 W. Trade Street Suite 1800
Charlotte, NC 28202
Represented By
Trevor W. Swett, III
Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered
contact info
Andrew Thomas Houston
Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC
contact info
Richard Steele Wright
Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC
contact info
Travis Waterbury Moon
Moon Wright & Houston, PLLC
contact info
Consol Defendant
C Andrew Waters
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Stanley Iola, LLP
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Simon Greenstone Panatier Bartlett
Represented By
Avery B. Pardee
Jones, Walker LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark A. Cunningham
Jones Walker, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Jeffery B Simon
Represented By
Avery B. Pardee
Jones, Walker LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark A. Cunningham
Jones Walker, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Benjamin P. Shein
Represented By
John B. Dempsey
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Donna A. Walsh
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Daniel T. Brier
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Resolute Management, Inc.
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Waters & Kraus
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
G. Martin Hunter
Shuford Hunter, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Peter A Kraus
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Bethann Schaffzin Kagan
Represented By
John B. Dempsey
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Donna A. Walsh
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Daniel T. Brier
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Mark Iola
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By
H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Davis & Hamrick, L.L.P.
contact info
Nava Hazan
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
David C Greenstone
Represented By
Avery B. Pardee
Jones, Walker LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark A. Cunningham
Jones Walker, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Jordan Fox
Represented By
Caroline E. Reynolds
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Voce-Gardner
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
James Sottile
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
AIU Insurance Company
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Estate of Ronald C Eddins
Represented By
Avery B. Pardee
Jones, Walker LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark A. Cunningham
Jones Walker, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
American Home Assurance Company
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By
Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto, P.A.
contact info
John S. Favate
Hardin Kundla Mckeon & Poletto P.A.
contact info
Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Allman Spry Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
George Dudley Humphrey, III
Allman Spry Davis Leggett & Crumpler, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Michael L Armitage
Represented By
Vineet Bhatia
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Stephen D. Susman
Susman Godfrey L.L.P.
contact info
Ashley McMillian
Susman Godfrey, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Jennifer L Bartlett
Represented By
Avery B. Pardee
Jones, Walker LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Michael W. Magner
Jones Walker LLP
contact info
Mark A. Cunningham
Jones Walker, LLP
contact info
Consol Defendant
Joseph W. Belluck
Represented By
Caroline E. Reynolds
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Benjamin J. Voce-Gardner
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
James Sottile
Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Garlock Sealing Technologies LLC
Represented By
Garland Stuart Cassada
contact info
D. Blaine Sanders
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Jonathan C. Krisko
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Louis Adams Bledsoe, III
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By
Alice Sacks Johnston
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Hawkins Parnell Thackston & Young LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
The Anchor Packing Company
Represented By
Garland Stuart Cassada
contact info
Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Jonathan C. Krisko
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Everest Reinsurance Company
Represented By
Fred L. Alvarez
Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP
contact info
Tony L. Draper
Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP
contact info
Charles Brittain Walther
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info
J. Samuel Gorham, III
J. Samuel Gorham, Iii, Attorney
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Michael H. Brady
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Kirk Gibson Warner
Smith Anderson
contact info
E. Duncan Getchell, Jr.
Mcguirewoods, LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Garrison Litigation Management, Ltd
Represented By
Garland Stuart Cassada
contact info
Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Robinson Bradshaw & Hinson, P.A.
contact info
Jonathan C. Krisko
Robinson, Bradshaw & Hinson, P. A.
contact info
Defendant
Belluck & Fox, LLP
301 S. McDowell St. Suite 1014
Charlotte, NC 28204
Represented By
G. Martin Hunter
Shuford Hunter, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mt. McKinley Insurance Company
Represented By
Fred L. Alvarez
Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP
contact info
Tony L. Draper
Walker Wilcox Matousek, LLP
contact info
Charles Brittain Walther
Walker Wilcox Matousek LLP
contact info
J. Samuel Gorham, III
J. Samuel Gorham, Iii, Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Mark Iola, LLP
301 S. McDowell St. Suite 1014
Charlotte, NC 28204
Represented By
G. Martin Hunter
Shuford Hunter, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Shein Law Center Ltd
301 S. McDowell St. Suite 1014
Charlotte, NC 28204
Represented By
John B. Dempsey
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Sara Wyche Higgins
Higgins & Owens, PLLC
contact info
Donna A. Walsh
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
Daniel T. Brier
Myers, Brier & Kelly, LLP
contact info
G. Martin Hunter
Shuford Hunter, PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Simon Greenstone et al
301 S. McDowell St. Suite 1014
Charlotte, NC 28204
Represented By
G. Martin Hunter
Shuford Hunter, PLLC
contact info
Intervenor
Coltec Industries, Inc.
Represented By
E. Taylor Stukes
Moore & Van Allen, PLLC
contact info
Mark Andrew Nebrig
Moore & Van Allen
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/13/2014 12:19 PM EDT
Wednesday, August 14, 2013
Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney. (blf)
Related: [-]
1 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court case number 10-31607 filed by Legal Newsline. (bkCH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re: Appeal