Texas Western District Court
Judge:Royce C Lamberth
Case #: 5:13-cv-00728
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 14, 2013
Terminated:Apr 16, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Jan 01, 2015 2:43 AM CST
Defendant
KHG of San Antonio, L.L.C.
Represented By
W. Scott Schulten
Schulten Ward & Turner, LLP
contact info
Lilia S. Marek
Rougeux & Associates PLLC
contact info
Dean R. Fuchs
Schulten Ward & Turner, LLP
contact info
Susan Kastan Murphey
Schulten Ward & Turner, LLP
contact info
Natalie C. Rougeux
Rougeux & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexis Alex
Represented By
Martin A. Shellist
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info
Ricardo Jose Prieto
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info
Todd Slobin
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicolette Prieto
Represented By
Martin A. Shellist
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info
Ricardo Jose Prieto
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info
Todd Slobin
Shellist Lazarz Slobin LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 28 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)

1. Trial begins Monday in stripper labor lawsuit (mysanantonio.com)
Submitted Tue 03/10/2015
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, August 28, 2015
144 144 order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 08/28 11:28 AM
ORDER GRANTING135 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)
Related: [-]
143 143 15 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Fri 08/28 11:26 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (ac)
Related: [-]