Joint Admin
|
8:13-bk-74304 - Personal Communications Devices Holdings, LLC
|
08/19/2013
|
Adversary
|
8:13-ap-08173 - Personal Communications Devices,LLC v. Christopher et al
|
10/25/2013
|
Adversary
|
8:13-ap-08174 - The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors on b v. DLJ Investment Partners, L.P. et al
|
10/28/2013
|
Adversary
|
8:13-ap-08175 - Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors on behal v. U.S. Bank National Association
|
10/28/2013
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08082 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Computer Equipment Services, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08096 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08083 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Consolidated Shippers, Incorporated
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08084 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Con-way Freight Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08085 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Covenant Transport, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08086 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Custom Global Logistics, LLC
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08087 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. David Reeves Studio, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08088 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Delphi Automotive LLP
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08089 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Diamond Staffing Services, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08090 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Dickstein Shapiro LLP
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08091 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Electro Rent Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08092 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Fashion Forward Worldwide Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08093 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Federal Express Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08094 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08095 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Findlay Craft, P.C.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08097 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Michelle Garcia Melind
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08098 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Dean Gerrard
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08099 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Givens Logistics, L.C.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08100 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Gongqing Chen Cellon Communications Technology Co.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08101 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. G. Pulse International Co., Ltd.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08102 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Greystone Staffing, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08080 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Cigna Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08081 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08060 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. 3 P.M. Limited
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08061 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. American Express Company
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08062 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Robert Half Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08063 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Shine Electronics Co., Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08064 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. The Richards Group, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08065 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Tyco Integrated Security LLC
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08066 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08067 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. VOXX International Corporation
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08068 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Wells Fargo Insurance Services USA, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08069 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Accurate Reclamation Group Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08071 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Agilent Financial Services
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08072 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Air-City Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08073 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. American Express Travel Related Services Company,
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08074 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Andrews International, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08075 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Anthro Interactive LLC
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08076 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Asian Business Base HK Co., Ltd.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08077 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Asurion, LLC
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08078 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. CIT Group, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08079 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Belleayre Office Systems, Inc.
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08070 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. ADP, LLC
|
04/01/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08117 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Randstad US, L.P.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08118 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Ricoh Americas Corporation
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08119 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. SBG Distr'ibution, LLC
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08120 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Selective Personnel Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08121 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08122 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Soluciones Celulares S.A.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08123 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. SupplyOne New York, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08108 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Kerry Freight (USA) Incorporated
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08124 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Telexpress, SA
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08125 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Tran-Star Executive Transportation Services Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08126 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. NFP Property & Casualty Services, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08127 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. TSA Services, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08128 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Shea Trucking
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08115 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Primeline Services LLC
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08103 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Guardian Packaging and Supply
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08104 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Hewitt Marketing, LLC
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08105 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Import Commodity Group Ltd.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08106 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. InnerWorkings, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08107 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Iosue Associates, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08109 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. LA Technology Group LLC
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08110 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Mara Brothers Commercial Construction Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08111 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Philip C. Minasian
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08112 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. M Seven System Limited
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08113 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Novack and Macey, LLP
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08114 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. Pilot Air Freight Corp.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08116 - Devices Liquidation Trust v. P & W Electric, Inc.
|
04/02/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08236 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. Hitachi High Technologies America, Inc.
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08237 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. KMT Wireless, LLC
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08238 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. King & Spalding LLP
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08239 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08240 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. Stroz Friedberg, LLC
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08241 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. Transparent Container Co., Inc.
|
08/18/2015
|
Adversary
|
8:15-ap-08242 - Devices Liquidation Trust, v. Wistron NeWeb Corporation
|
08/18/2015
|