Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Evelyn J Furse
Case #: 2:13-cv-00797
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Aug 27, 2013
Terminated:Mar 03, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 2:06 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Maxwell W. Jackson
Counter Defendant
Color Run, The
Represented By
David L. Mortensen
Stoel Rives (ut)
contact info
Jose A. Abarca
Stoel Rives (ut)
contact info
Defendant
Maxwell W. Jackson
an individual 632 NW 13TH ST APT 16
BOCA RATON, FL 33486
Plaintiff
Color Run, The
Represented By
David L. Mortensen
Stoel Rives (ut)
contact info
Jose A. Abarca
Stoel Rives (ut)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Philip Maddsen
ThirdParty Defendant
Kyle Myers
ThirdParty Defendant
Ryan Robinson
ThirdParty Defendant
Silverback Enterprises Kansas
ThirdParty Defendant
Travis Lyman Snyder
ThirdParty Defendant
Sports Authority, The
Represented By
David L. Mortensen
Stoel Rives (ut)
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Stoel Rives
ThirdParty Defendant
Treidi
ThirdParty Defendant
Scott Winn
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Maxwell W. Jackson

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2014
31 31 Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (tls)
Related: [-]
30 30 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Dismiss Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 03/03/2014. (tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2014
29 29 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Color Run, The.(Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 14, 2014
28 28 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Joinder. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 01/13/2014. (tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2014
27 27 DOCKET TEXT ORDER - The court orders the parties to follow the Short Form Discovery Motion procedure as outlined in the attached document in this case for all discovery disputes. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 1/10/2014. (rks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2014
26 26 Motions No Longer Referred:21 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Defendant's Counterclaims (euj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2014
25 25 ORDER STAYING CASE. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 01/02/2014. (tls)
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Dismiss; denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot 12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 01/02/2014. (tls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2013
23 23 ORDER granting 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 12/10/2013. (tls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2013
22 22 NOTICE of Joinder by Sports Authority, The re13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue (Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 MOTION for Joinder and Memorandum in Support re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Color Run, The, ThirdParty Defendant Sports Authority, The. Motions referred to Evelyn J. Furse.(Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Color Run, The. (Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2013
19 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant Maxwell W. Jackson. (asp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2013
18 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/25/2013. (tls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2013
16 16 After review of this case, Case Reassigned to District Judge per 15 Order. Case randomly assigned to Judge Robert J. Shelby. Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells no longer assigned to the case. (asp)
Related: [-]
15 15 DOCKET TEXT ORDER FOR CASE TO BE REASSIGNED. Based upon the procedural posture of this case and the pending motions to dismiss ( 8 , 14 ), consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge is not immediately feasible. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be reassigned to a district judge through random reassignment.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells on 10/23/2013. No attached document.(lam)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2013
14 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Plaintiff Color Run, The.(Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David J. Pacheco
Monday, October 14, 2013
13 13 Plaintiff's MEMORANDUM in Opposition re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue filed by Plaintiff Color Run, The.(Abarca, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter from M. Jackson to T. Snyder
Tuesday, October 08, 2013
17 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Defendant Maxwell W. Jackson. See document12 for image. (asp)
Related: [-]
12 12 **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Defendant Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
11 11 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Treidi, Travis Lyman Snyder, Philip Maddsen, Stoel Rives, Scott Winn, Sports Authority, The, Silverback Enterprises Kansas, Kyle Myers, Ryan Robinson, filed by Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
10 10 COUNTERCLAIM against Color Run, The, filed by Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
9 9 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION of Defendant in Support re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Defendant Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support, MOTION to Change Venue and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
7 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Maxwell W. Jackson (alt)
Related: [-]
6 6 DOCUMENT LODGED consisting of correspondence from dft (alt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2013
5 5 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Color Run, The as to Maxwell W. Jackson served on 9/6/2013, answer due 9/27/2013. (Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2013
4 4 **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** Summons Issued Electronically as to Maxwell W. Jackson. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (rls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2013
3 3 Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (rls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint & Exhibits
Tuesday, August 27, 2013
2 2 COMPLAINT against Maxwell W. Jackson (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-1897429), filed by Color Run, The. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells (Mortensen, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Facebook screen shot,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Brooke C. Wells. Plaintiff Color Run, The is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day. NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (rls)
Related: [-]