New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:16-cv-06212
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2016
Terminated:Mar 23, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 31, 2017 4:41 AM EST
Defendant
Marc J. Bern
Represented By
Joanne Jennifer Romero
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Peter J. Biging
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Brian Howard Brick
Bern Ripka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bern Ripka LLP
Represented By
Joanne Jennifer Romero
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Peter J. Biging
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Brian Howard Brick
Bern Ripka LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paul J. Napoli
Represented By
Laura Baldwin Juffa
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan Llp(v'Lhalla)
contact info
Defendant
Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP
Represented By
Andrew Leslie Margulis
Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley
contact info
Kirsten Lee Molloy
Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley
contact info
Defendant
Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP
Represented By
Andrew Leslie Margulis
Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley
contact info
Kirsten Lee Molloy
Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley
contact info
Defendant
Napoli Shkolnik PLLC
Represented By
Laura Baldwin Juffa
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan Llp(v'Lhalla)
contact info
Paul Brian Maslo
Napoli Sholnik PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alan S. Ripka, Esq.
Defendant
Hunter Shkolnik
Represented By
Laura Baldwin Juffa
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan Llp(v'Lhalla)
contact info
Paul Brian Maslo
Napoli Sholnik PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gloria Werle
Represented By
Laura Baldwin Juffa
Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan Llp(v'Lhalla)
contact info
Paul Brian Maslo
Napoli Sholnik PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alan S. Ripka
Represented By
Joanne Jennifer Romero
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Peter J. Biging
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Brian Howard Brick
Bern Ripka LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Della Ifill
Represented By
Paul J. Sagar
The Seltzer Law Group P.C.
contact info
Steven Seltzer
The Seltzer Law Group P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, June 01, 2018
118 118 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 06/01 12:36 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Della Ifill ("Plaintiff") and Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates LLP, Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, Bern Ripka LLP, Marc J. Bern & Partners LLP, Paul Napoli, Marc Bern, Hunter Shkolnik, Alan Ripka, and Gloria Werle (collectively "Defendants" and with Ifill, the "Parties") that the above captioned action is hereby discontinued with prejudice, and without costs or attorneys' fees to either party as against the other. The parties have stipulated to the dismissal of this action under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Marc J. Bern & Partners, LLP, Paul J. Napoli, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, Alan S. Ripka, Hunter Shkolnik, Gloria Werle, Marc J. Bern and Bern Ripka LLP terminated.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/1/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
misc Note to Attorney - Document Referred to Judge for Approval Thu 05/31 10:15 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Steven Seltzer Document 117 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Gregory H. Woods for approval. (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
117 117 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/30 6:07 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Marc J. Bern, Bern Ripka LLP, Marc J. Bern & Partners, LLP, Paul J. Napoli, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik & Associates, LLP, Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik, LLP, Napoli Shkolnik PLLC, Alan S. Ripka, Hunter Shkolnik, Gloria Werle and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Della Ifill.(Seltzer, Steven)
Related: [-]