Victorinox AG v. B&F System, Inc.
Original Case: 1:13-cv-04534
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-02690 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 21, 2017 4:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABC Corporations, 1-10
|
|
Defendant
John Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
The BF System, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
John D. Meyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant-Counter-Claimant - Appellant
B&F System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Locke Lord LLP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Victorinox AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Victorinox Swiss Army, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff-Counter-Defendant - Appellee
Wenger NA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/21/2017 4:32 AM EDT |
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant John D. Meyer and The BF System, Inc, USCA receipt # 020812600888, FILED.[1832034] 16-2690 [Entered: 08/03/2016 01:48 PM] | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |