United Mobile Solutions, LLC v. Procurepal, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-62537
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-62537
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara Ellis-Monro |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-05177 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Procurepal, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United Mobile Solutions, LLC
6140 Northbelt Parkway, Suite A
Norcross, GA 30071 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
misc
Adversary Closed
Tue 04/17 8:58 AM
Adversary 1:16-ap-5177 Closed (cws) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 04/04 10:44 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Sunday, April 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice (301,302)
Mon 04/02 3:48 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice. Notice Date 04/01/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Notice of Case Reassignment
Fri 03/30 8:42 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from the Honorable Barbara Ellis-Monro to the Honorable Sage M. Sigler. Service by BNC (asb) |
|
Sunday, March 04, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency
Mon 03/05 1:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Notice Date 03/04/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Deficiency - Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/02 11:14 AM
Notice of deficient filing re: Notice of Dismissal - Missing Certificate of Service, . Service by BNC. (cws) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Thu 03/01 11:53 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case (Doc. No. 278) Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice
Wed 02/28 8:34 PM
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492)
Sat 02/17 1:18 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 02/16/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
order
01-Order
Wed 02/14 9:44 AM
Ordered that within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall show cause by written pleading why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed. Service by BNC. Entered on 2/14/2018. (cws) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 08/10 2:34 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Tue 08/09 5:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 08/09 10:31 AM
Summons Issued on Procurepal, LLC Answer Due 09/8/2016 (smw) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/08 10:55 AM
Adversary case 16-05177 Complaint against Procurepal, LLC , 12 Filed by United Mobile Solutions, LLC (McCord, Cameron) |