United Mobile Solutions, LLC v. Small Business Credit Cooperative, Inc., as Assign
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-62537
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-62537
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barbara Ellis-Monro |
Case #: | 1:16-ap-05178 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Apr 23, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Small Business Credit Cooperative, Inc., as Assignee of Nowaccount Network Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United Mobile Solutions, LLC
6140 Northbelt Parkway, Suite A
Norcross, GA 30071 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
misc
Adversary Closed
Mon 04/23 8:55 AM
Adversary 1:16-ap-5178 Closed (cws) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 04/04 10:57 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Sunday, April 01, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice (301,302)
Mon 04/02 3:48 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Case Reassignment Notice. Notice Date 04/01/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Case Reassignment
Fri 03/30 8:42 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment from the Honorable Barbara Ellis-Monro to the Honorable Sage M. Sigler. Service by BNC (asb) |
|
Sunday, March 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency
Mon 03/05 1:30 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency Notice Date 03/04/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Deficiency - Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/02 11:17 AM
Notice of deficient filing re: Notice of dismissal - Missing Certificate of Service, . Service by BNC. (cws) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Thu 03/01 11:52 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Dismissing Debtor's Chapter 11 Case (Doc. No. 278) Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Wed 02/28 8:33 PM
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492)
Sat 02/17 1:18 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Notice Date 02/16/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
01-Order
Wed 02/14 10:10 AM
Ordered that within 14 days after entry of this Order, Plaintiff shall show cause by written pleading why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed. Service by BNC. Entered on 2/14/2018. (cws) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/08 3:41 PM
Joint Stipulation and Consent to Extend Time to Respond Filed by Richard B. Herzog Jr. on behalf of Small Business Credit Cooperative, Inc., as Assignee of Nowaccount Network Corporation. (Herzog, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Wed 08/10 4:59 PM
Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
0-Certificate of Service
Tue 08/09 5:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Cameron M. McCord on behalf of United Mobile Solutions, LLC. (McCord, Cameron) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Tue 08/09 10:33 AM
Summons Issued on Small Business Credit Cooperative, Inc., as Assignee of Nowaccount Network Corporation Answer Due 09/8/2016 (smw) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/08 2:22 PM
Adversary case 16-05178 Complaint against Small Business Credit Cooperative, Inc., as Assignee of Nowaccount Network Corporation , 12 Filed by United Mobile Solutions, LLC (McCord, Cameron) |