Total Comm Systems, Inc. v. J D Factors, LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-15530
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-15530
Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Eric L Frank |
Case #: | 2:16-ap-00252 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
J D Factors, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Global Funding Experts, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Knight Capital Funding, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions
|
|
Defendant
High Speed Capital, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Richmond Capital Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
John Doe #1
|
|
Plaintiff
Total Comm Systems, Inc.
2480 Durham Road, Unit A
Bristol, PA 19007 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 1:10 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 07/24 10:28 AM
Adversary Case 2:16-ap-252 Terminated for Statistical Purposes. (R., Donna) |
||
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
47 | 47
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 05/04 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 05/01 1:28 PM
Order Dismissing Case for lack of jurisdiction. . (G., Jeanette) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 05/01 1:29 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:16-ap-252 Dismissed . (G., Jeanette) |
||
Saturday, June 17, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 06/18 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/17/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
order
Stipulation
Thu 06/15 10:49 AM
Order Approving Stipulation of Settlement By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, LLC and Knight Capital Funding, LL . (G., Jeanette) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Settlement
Tue 06/13 2:37 PM
Stipulation of Settlement By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, LLC and Knight Capital Funding, LLC Filed by DAVID M. KLAUDER on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. (KLAUDER, DAVID) |
|
Saturday, April 29, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 04/30 1:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
order
Pre-Trial Order
Thu 04/27 2:41 PM
Pre-Trial Order #2. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 6/22/2017 at 01:00 PM at nix1 - courtroom #1. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 6/16/2017. (G., Jeanette) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
motion
Extend / Shorten Time
Mon 04/24 11:55 AM
Motion to Extend time to Discovery Filed by Global Funding Experts, LLC Represented by RONALD JAY DRESCHER (Counsel). (DRESCHER, RONALD) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
court
Hearing Held
Mon 04/03 12:15 PM
Hearing Held on Stipulation By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, Inc. . Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc STIPULATION WITHDRAWN (L., Linda) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Praecipe to Withdraw Document
Tue 03/28 1:04 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Stipulation Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Wed 03/22 2:22 PM
Hearing Set re:37 Stipulation By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, Inc. . Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. filed by Plaintiff Total Comm Systems, Inc.. Hearing scheduled 3/29/2017 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. Counsel may appear by phone. (B., Pamela) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation
Mon 03/20 1:07 PM
Stipulation By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, Inc. . Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
Sunday, March 12, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 03/13 2:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Stipulation
Fri 03/10 4:33 PM
Order re:Stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that the request for approval of the stipulation is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the parties right to submit another Stipulation or a motion articulating "cause" for modification of the deadlines in the Pretrial Order. . (K., Marie) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Stipulation
Thu 03/09 11:32 AM
Stipulation By Total Comm Systems, Inc. and Between Global Funding Experts, Inc. . Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 11/24 1:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 21, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Pre-Trial Order
Mon 11/21 3:37 PM
Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled 5/25/2017 at 01:00 PM at nix1 - courtroom #1. Joint Pre-Trial Statement due by 5/17/2017. Discovery due by 3/16/2017. Joint Statement due by 12/7/2016. (G., Jeanette) |
|
Wednesday, November 16, 2016 | ||
31 | 31
court
Hearing Held
Fri 11/18 9:11 AM
Pretrial conference held and concluded. (G., Jeanette) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Proposed Order
Wed 11/16 1:43 PM
Proposed Order Re: -- Pretrial Scheduling Order -- Filed by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
29 | 29
court
Pre-Trial Hearing
Thu 11/10 2:31 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing rescheduled (TIME ONLY). Pre-Trial Hearing scheduled 11/16/2016 at 12:00 PM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (B., Pamela) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
28 | 28
court
Pre-Trial Hearing
Fri 10/21 2:37 PM
Pre-Trial Hearing. Pre-Trial conference scheduled 11/16/2016 at 11:00 AM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (B., Pamela) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/07 10:57 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Knight Capital Funding, LLC.(Rhoades, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/27 4:48 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Alias Summons upon (i)Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions, (ii) High Speed Capital LLC, and (iii) Richmond Capital Group, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
Att: 2 Certificates of Mailing | ||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
court
Alias Summons Issued
Tue 09/20 11:58 AM
Alias Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Global Funding Experts, LLC Date Issued 9/20/2016, Answer Due 10/20/2016; Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions Date Issued 9/20/2016, Answer Due 10/20/2016; High Speed Capital, LLC Date Issued 9/20/2016, Answer Due 10/20/2016; Richmond Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 9/20/2016, Answer Due 10/20/2016. (G., Jennifer) |
|
Monday, September 19, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Praecipe to Re-Issue
Mon 09/19 3:10 PM
Praecipe to Re-Issue Summons against (i) Global Funding Experts, LLC, (ii) Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions; (iii) High Speed Capital, LLC; and (iv) Richmond Capital Group, LLC Filed by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/15 12:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Global Funding Experts, LLC. (DRESCHER, RONALD) |
|
Sunday, September 11, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 09/12 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/11/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 09, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Cancelled
Fri 09/09 3:33 PM
Hearing on Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document filed by Plaintiff Total Comm Systems, Inc. Cancelled. Reason for Cancellation: WITHDRAWN. (G., Jeanette) |
|
20 | 20
order
Stipulation
Fri 09/09 2:31 PM
Order re: Stipulation and Order e Extending time For Knight Capital Funding, LLC To Respond To Adversary Complain . Knight Capital Funding, LLC, may respond to Adversary Complaint is extended to October 7, 2016 (G., Jeanette) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/08 2:47 PM
Stipulation By Knight Capital Funding, LLC and Between Total Comm Systems, Inc. . Filed by Mark L Rhoades on behalf of Knight Capital Funding, LLC. (Rhoades, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, September 06, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Praecipe
Tue 09/06 4:13 PM
Praecipe /Notice to Dismiss J D Factors, LLC with prejudice -- Filed by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc.. (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
17 | 17
misc
Praecipe to Withdraw Document
Tue 09/06 3:59 PM
Praecipe to Withdraw Filed by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Withdraw Document
Tue 09/06 3:15 PM
Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document Filed by Total Comm Systems, Inc. Represented by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI (Counsel). (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Att: 2 Service List | ||
Friday, August 19, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:51 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Richmond Capital Group, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:50 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Knight Capital Funding, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:48 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon John Doe #1 Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon J D Factors, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:45 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon High Speed Capital, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:44 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/19 12:42 PM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Global Funding Experts, LLC Filed by CORY P. STEPHENSON on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (STEPHENSON, CORY) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
court
Hearing Continued
Fri 08/12 3:49 PM
Hearing Continued on2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction -- Debtor/Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant J D Factors, LLC -- filed by Plaintiff Total Comm Systems, Inc.. Hearing scheduled 9/9/2016 at 01:00 PM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (G., Jeanette) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Objection
Fri 08/12 10:13 AM
Objection to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Total Comm Systems, Inc. Filed by J D Factors, LLC . (RICHARDS, DEIRDRE) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Brief In Support of Objection | ||
Att: 2 Appendix Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Fri 08/12 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/11/2016. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/09 12:33 PM
Certificate of Service of the: (1) Debtor/Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant J D Factors, LLC (D.I. 2); and (2) Order Scheduling Expedited Hearing on Debtor/Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant J D Factors, LLC (D.I. 3) Filed by DAVID M. KLAUDER on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. . (KLAUDER, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1 Service List | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Tue 08/09 11:28 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) John Doe #1 Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; Global Funding Experts, LLC Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; High Speed Capital, LLC Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; J D Factors, LLC Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; Knight Capital Funding, LLC Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016; Richmond Capital Group, LLC Date Issued 8/9/2016, Answer Due 9/8/2016. (G., Jennifer) |
|
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Hearing
Tue 08/09 9:49 AM
Order Scheduling Hearing re:2 Debtor/Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant J D Factors, LLC . Hearing scheduled 8/12/2016 at 01:00 PM at nix1 - courtroom #1. (G., Jeanette) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Mon 08/08 4:48 PM
Motion for Preliminary Injunction -- Debtor/Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction Against Defendant J D Factors, LLC -- Filed by Total Comm Systems, Inc. Represented by THOMAS DANIEL BIELLI (Counsel). (BIELLI, THOMAS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Brief | ||
Att: 5 Declaration | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order to Expedite | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/08 3:24 PM
Adversary case 16-00252 Complaint by DAVID M. KLAUDER on behalf of Total Comm Systems, Inc. against J D Factors, LLC, Global Funding Experts, LLC, Knight Capital Funding, LLC, Happy Rock Merchant Solutions, LLC a/k/a Happy Rock Solutions, High Speed Capital, LLC, Richmond Capital Group, LLC, John Doe #1. Fee Amount $350 . (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (KLAUDER, DAVID) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 08/08 3:28 PM
Receipt of Complaint 16-00252 elf) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 17712560. Fee Amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |