WILLIAMS v. KALO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark E Walker |
Referred: | Charles A Stampelos |
Case #: | 4:16-cv-00502 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 05, 2017 3:36 AM EST |
Defendant
KALO RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC D/B/A JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KALO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TEALEASHEA WILLIAMS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Acknowledgment
Wed 04/19 2:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Green Card Return re19 Order. (tdl) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/17 2:29 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to TEALEASHEA WILLIAMS Re:19 ORDER. (tdl) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/23 7:17 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE - Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 1 , is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff via certified return receipt. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/22/2017. (tdl) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 03/22 10:34 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 3/22/2017. Court dismisses case without prejudice. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Megan Hague.) (pll) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Mon 03/20 7:43 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:14 Order. STAY CASE FOR 30 DAYS - Complete (tdl) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
service
Acknowledgment of Service
Thu 02/23 1:26 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on 2/16/2017 as to T. Williams re 16 Docket Annotation. (tdl) |
|
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 02/15 3:27 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re 15 Notice of Hearing and14 Order Staying Case sent to Plaintiff via Certified, Return Receipt mail to 2605 HARTSFIELD ROADTALLAHASSEE, FL 32302 #70060100000309845229. (pll) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 02/15 8:24 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/22/2017 10:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Pam Lourcey at 850-521-3501 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Pam Lourcey Courtroom Deputy Clerk (pll) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/14 2:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING 13 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL AND STAYING CASE FOR 30 DAYS. The Clerk is directed to set a telephonic status conference after March 16, 2017. (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 3/15/2017 .) Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/14/2017. (tdl) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/14 8:51 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TEALEASHEA WILLIAMS. (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Wednesday, November 23, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/23 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of TEALEASHEA WILLIAMS (ELLIS, ADAM) |
|
Friday, October 28, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/28 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHAREE D ERIKS on behalf of KALO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC (ERIKS, SHAREE) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Thu 10/20 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Statement Of Compliance With Rule 26 by TEALEASHEA WILLIAMS (MATTOX, MARIE) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Mon 09/26 7:41 AM
SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re 8 Report: (Discovery due by 3/31/2017 ., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/21/2017 ., Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE MARK E WALKER., Mediation Report due by 5/12/2017 .) Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/23/2016. (tdl) |
|
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Fri 09/23 9:16 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re:8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (vkm) |
||
Thursday, September 22, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Thu 09/22 3:24 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SOKOLOW, DENA) |
|
Monday, August 29, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 08/29 2:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by KALO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. (SOKOLOW, DENA) |
|
Tuesday, August 16, 2016 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/16 3:59 PM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by KALO RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. (SOKOLOW, DENA) |
|
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 08/16 3:15 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/30/2016 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/29/2016 . Discovery due by 12/14/2016 . Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/16/2016. (kjw) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order of Recusal
Tue 08/16 8:41 AM
ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION. JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE recused. Case reassigned to JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/16/2016. (tdl) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 08/11 9:39 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SOKOLOW, DENA) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 08/11 8:17 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY DENA SOKOLOW re1 Notice. Counsel is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". (tdl) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2016 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 08/09 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KALO RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC D/B/A JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS from Leon County Circuit Court, case number 2016-CA-1377. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-3648439.), filed by KALO RESTAURANT GROUP, LLC D/B/A JERSEY MIKE'S SUBS. (SOKOLOW, DENA) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C |