California Eastern District Court
Judge:Lawrence J O'Neill
Referred: Jennifer L Thurston
Case #: 1:16-cv-01166
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2016
Terminated:Dec 19, 2016
Last checked: Saturday Feb 04, 2017 1:59 AM PST
Defendant
Rene Ayon
Represented By
Anthony N. DeMaria
Mccormick Barstow LLP
contact info
Defendant
Juan Brito
Represented By
Gregory Lee Myers
Law Offices Of Gregory L. Myers
contact info
Defendant
Delano Joint Union School District
Represented By
Anthony N. DeMaria
Mccormick Barstow LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jean Flores
Represented By
Leonard Charles Herr
Herr Pedersen & Berglund, LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Hay
Represented By
Michael Charles Kellar
Robinson & Kellar
contact info
Defendant
Anna Perigo
Represented By
Christopher John Hagan
Brumfield & Hagan
contact info
Defendant
Rosalina Rivera
Represented By
Arnold J Anchordoquy
Clifford & Brown
contact info
Defendant
Marke Rodriguez
Represented By
Clayton U. Hall
Hall, Hieatt & Connely, LLP
contact info
Anthony N. DeMaria
Mccormick Barstow LLP
contact info
Stephanie A Bowen
Hall, Hieatt & Connely, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
E.F.
Represented By
John Kawai
Rodriguez & Associates
contact info
Daniel Rodriguez
Rodriguez And Associates
contact info
Chantal Amber Trujillo
Rodriguez And Associates
contact info
Joel T Andreesen
Rodriguez & Associates
contact info

GPO Oct 06 2016
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting Defendants' 13 15 20 21 Motions to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/05/2016. (Flores, E)
GPO Dec 19 2016
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE ACTION, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)

Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Monday, December 19, 2016
44 44 order Order Dismissing Case ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 12/19 11:27 AM
ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE ACTION, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
43 43 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 12/15 9:56 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by E.F.. (Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
42 42 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/29 11:06 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Anna Perigo.(Hagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2016
41 41 order Minute Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing Mon 11/28 1:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The hearings on the pending motions to dismiss34 ,36 ,38 , and39 are CONTINUED to 12/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 28, 2016. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/23 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District re39 MOTION to DISMISS. (DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Dismiss Wed 11/23 10:47 AM
MOTION to DISMISS by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District. Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
38 38 motion Dismiss Tue 11/22 11:08 AM
MOTION to DISMISS by James Hay. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Kellar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2016
37 37 misc Proposed Order Tue 11/15 3:07 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Rodriguez's Motion to Dismiss re36 MOTION to DISMISS by Marke Rodriguez. (Bowen, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Dismiss Tue 11/15 3:05 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Marke Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Bowen, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
35 35 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Mon 11/14 2:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/14/2016: In light of the pending motion to dismiss, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2016 at 09:00 AM is CONTINUED to 2/16/2017 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 09, 2016
34 34 motion Dismiss Wed 11/09 11:17 AM
MOTION to DISMISS by Jean Flores. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
33 33 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/01 11:32 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Juan Brito.(Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/26 3:20 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by E.F..(Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2016
31 31 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 10/07 10:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ENTRY ONLY), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/7/2016: In light of the current posture of this case, the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2016 at 08:30 AM is CONTINUED to 12/20/2016 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2016
30 30 order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/06 10:30 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER Granting Defendants'13 15 20 21 Motions to Dismiss signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/05/2016. (Flores, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2016
29 29 misc Reply Mon 09/26 2:57 PM
REPLY by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District re13 MOTION to DISMISS. (DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/26 2:35 PM
REPLY by Jean Flores to RESPONSE to20 MOTION to DISMISS. (Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
27 27 order Minute Order ~Util - Motions Submitted/Under Advisement Fri 09/23 12:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has received and reviewed preliminarily the briefs filed thus far in connection with the multiple pending motions to dismiss13 15 20 21 and concludes that the matters can be decided on the papers without oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). Upon the expiration of the relevant reply deadlines, the matters will be taken under submission and written rulings will issue. The hearings on the pending motions to dismiss, set for 9/29/16 and 10/3/16 are therefore VACATED signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on September 23, 2016. (Munoz, I)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/22 3:32 PM
REPLY by Marke Rodriguez to RESPONSE to15 MOTION to DISMISS. (Bowen, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
25 25 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 09/20 6:56 PM
OPPOSITION by E.F. to13 MOTION to DISMISS. (Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 09/20 6:53 PM
OPPOSITION by E.F. to15 MOTION to DISMISS. (Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 09/20 6:49 PM
OPPOSITION by E.F. to20 MOTION to DISMISS. (Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2016
22 22 respm Opposition to Motion Fri 09/16 4:30 PM
OPPOSITION by E.F. to21 MOTION to DISMISS. (Trujillo, Chantal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 5:06 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by James Hay. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Kellar, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 4:42 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Jean Flores. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6)
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/29 4:37 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Anna Perigo.(Hagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Proposed Order Mon 08/29 3:21 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re Rodriguez' Motion to Dismiss re15 MOTION to DISMISS by Marke Rodriguez. (Bowen, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/29 3:16 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Rosalina Rivera.(Anchordoquy, Arnold)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/29 3:01 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James Hay. (Kellar, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 2:58 PM
MOTION to DISMISS by Marke Rodriguez. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Bowen, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service Mon 08/29 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District re13 MOTION to DISMISS. (DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Mon 08/29 11:48 AM
MOTION to DISMISS by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2016 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill.(DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion for More Definite Statement (Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) (6) & 12 (e)),
Att: 2 Notice Request for Judicial Notice in support of Defendants' Delano Joint Union High School District and Rene Ayon's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Definite Statement Pursuant to FRCP 12 (b)(6) & 12 (e),
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Delano Joint Union High School District and Rene Ayon's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for MOre Definite Statement
Friday, August 26, 2016
12 12 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Fri 08/26 11:46 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan Brito. (Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/26 11:45 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Juan Brito.(Myers, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Fri 08/26 10:05 AM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jean Flores. (Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Substitution of Attorney Order Fri 08/26 9:31 AM
ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/25/2016. Added attorney Clayton U. Hall,Stephanie Ann Bowen for Marke Rodriguez, attorney Anthony N. DeMaria terminated. (Sant Agata, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2016
8 8 misc Substitution of Attorney - Proposed Thu 08/25 3:20 PM
SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Marke Rodriguez. (Hall, Clayton)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Thu 08/25 2:04 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rene Ayon, Delano Joint Union School District. (DeMaria, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2016
6 6 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Mon 08/22 2:25 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anna Perigo. (Hagan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2016
5 5 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Tue 08/16 10:12 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Rosalina Rivera. (Anchordoquy, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
4 4 misc Stipulation Fri 08/12 4:40 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings by Jean Flores. (Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2016
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for LJO Tue 08/09 10:05 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/8/2016 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Jessen, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
Monday, August 08, 2016
2 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL filed by Jean Flores.(Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
1 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jean Flores (Herr, Leonard).
Related: [-]
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-6605378. (Herr, Leonard)
Related: [-]