KFC Corporation v. Ghori et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Simpson, III |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-00515 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1051 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2016 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
Chooza, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ghazi Ghori
|
|
Plaintiff
KFC Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice - US Patent & Trademark
Tue 02/28 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Determination re: Patent or Trademark re11 Default Judgment. (RLK) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 01/11 9:49 AM
JUDGMENT signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 1/10/2017, against Ghazi Ghori, and Chooza, LLC.cc: Counsel; Ghazi Ghori; Chooza, LLC (RLK) |
|
Friday, October 21, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 10/21 10:27 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Plaintiff KFC Corporation Responses due by 11/17/2016 (Brooker, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Ryan Epstein, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Christopher W. Brooker, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Thu 10/20 10:08 AM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY CLERK signed on 10/19/2016, as to Defendants Ghazi Ghori and Chooza, LLC. cc: Counsel, Ghazi Ghori, Chooza, LLC(RLK) |
|
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Entry of Default
Fri 10/07 8:44 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff KFC Corporation Responses due by 10/31/2016 (Brooker, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Christopher W. Brooker, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/20 4:47 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KFC Corporation. Chooza, LLC served on 9/15/2016, answer due 10/6/2016. (Brooker, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/20 4:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KFC Corporation. Ghazi Ghori served on 9/15/2016, answer due 10/6/2016. (Brooker, Christopher) |
|
Monday, August 15, 2016 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice - US Patent & Trademark
Mon 08/15 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Filing or Determination re:Patent or Trademark re1 Complaint. (DJT) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2016 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/11 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Chooza, LLC, Ghazi Ghori. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) |
|
Att: 1 Summons as to Chooza, LLC | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/11 2:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Yum! Brands, Inc., Corporate Parent KFC Holding Co. for KFC Corporation.. (DJT) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Thu 08/11 2:19 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Colin H. Lindsay. (DJT) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/11 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Chooza, LLC, Ghazi Ghori Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2275392, filed by KFC Corporation. (DJT) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Partial List of KFC Marks, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Kentucky Fried Chicken Franchise Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - March 8, 1999 Assignment of Franchise and Release, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - June 22, 2007 Assignment of Franchise and Release, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Transfer Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Franchise Agreement Amendment Documents, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Advertising Agreement, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H - Control Person Addendum, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I - Guaranty, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J - Default Letters, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K - Termination Letter, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L - Reinstatement Agreement Documents, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M - June 30, 2016 Confirmation of Termination Letter, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N - July 11, 2016 Photographs of "Closed for Repair" Signs |