Clark v. Advanced Composites Group, et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | George B Daniels |
Referred: | Sarah Netburn |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-06422 |
Nature of Suit | 368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal - Suit against Federal Officer |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2016 |
Re-opened: | Apr 20, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 08, 2017 4:20 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
CBS Corporation
|
|
Cross Claimant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Georgia Pacific LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Goodyear Canada Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Harco Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Hollingsworth & Vose Co.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
IMO Industries
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Lennox Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Mine Safety Appliance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Parker-Hannifin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Pirelli Cable Corporation
|
|
Cross Claimant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
United Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Henkel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
AII Acquisitions LLC
|
|
Cross Defendant
AWC1997 Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Aerco International, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
BMCE Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Crane Co.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Curtiss-Wright Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Domco Products Texas, LP
|
|
Cross Defendant
E.V. Roberts Headquarters
|
|
Cross Defendant
Eaton Aeroquip Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Eaton Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
FMC Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
General Cable Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
General Gasket Corp
|
|
Cross Defendant
Georgia Pacific LLC
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Goodyear Canada Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Harco Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Hollingsworth & Vose Co.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
IMO Industries
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Industrial Holdings Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
International Truck and Engine Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Lennox Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
McDonnell Douglas Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Navistar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Parker-Hannifin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Pecora Corp
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Perilli Tire
|
|
Cross Defendant
Pfizer,Inc.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Pirelli Cable Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Pirelli, Inc
|
|
Cross Defendant
Pneumo Abex Corporation
|
|
Cross Defendant
Saint-Gobain Adbrasives, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Henkel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AII Acquisitions LLC
|
|
Defendant
AWC1997 Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Aerco International, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BMCE Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
MARSHALL, DENNEHY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN 105 Maxess Road Suite 303
Melville, NY 11747 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CBS Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Crane Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Curtiss-Wright Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Domco Products Texas, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.V. Roberts Headquarters
|
|
Defendant
Eaton Aeroquip Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Cable Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Electric Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
General Gasket Corp
|
|
Defendant
Georgia Pacific LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodrich Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodyear Canada Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Harco Laboratories, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hollingsworth & Vose Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
IMO Industries
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Industrial Holdings Corporation
|
|
Defendant
International Truck and Engine Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Lennox Industries Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
McDonnell Douglas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Navistar, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Parker-Hannifin Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pecora Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perilli Tire
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer,Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pirelli Cable Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pirelli, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Pneumo Abex Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Saint-Gobain Adbrasives, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Boeing Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Henkel Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Clark
KARST & VON OISTE 576 5TH AVENUE
SUITE 706, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michele Clark
6600 Kitten Lake Drive
Midland, GA 31820 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Claimant
Advanced Composites Group
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Certainteed Corp
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Rockwell Automation, Inc., as successor in interest to Allen-Bradley Company, LLC
Terminated: 12/13/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Welco Manufacturing Company
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Claimant
Wyeth Holding Corp.
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Advanced Composites Group
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
BASF Corp.
Terminated: 12/05/2016
|
|
Cross Defendant
CIBA Giegy Corporation
Terminated: 12/05/2016
|
|
Cross Defendant
Certainteed Corp
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Greene Tweed & Company
Terminated: 11/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Hitco
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Rockwell Automation, Inc., as successor in interest to Allen-Bradley Company, LLC
Terminated: 12/13/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Terminated: 01/04/2017
|
|
Cross Defendant
Trane USA Inc.
Terminated: 12/07/2016
|
|
Cross Defendant
Welco Manufacturing Company
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Wyeth Holding Corp.
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Advanced Composites Group
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BASF Corp.
Terminated: 12/05/2016
100 Campus Drive
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
CIBA Giegy Corporation
Terminated: 12/05/2016
|
|
Defendant
Certainteed Corp
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eaton Corporation
Terminated: 11/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FMC Corporation
Terminated: 01/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Greene Tweed & Company
Terminated: 11/28/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hitco
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rockwell Automation, Inc., as successor in interest to Allen-Bradley Company, LLC
Terminated: 12/13/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Terminated: 01/04/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trane USA Inc.
Terminated: 12/07/2016
|
|
Defendant
Welco Manufacturing Company
Terminated: 11/21/2016
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wyeth Holding Corp.
Terminated: 10/20/2016
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
564 | 564
order
Memo Endorsement
Fri 01/21 2:43 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:563 Letter filed by Michele Clark. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/21/2022) (ras) |
|
563 | 563
misc
Letter
Fri 01/21 11:53 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Matthew B. McLeod dated 01/21/2022 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Michele Clark..(McLeod, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
562 | 562
misc
Proposed Stipulation and Order
Thu 01/20 5:52 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Henkel Corporation..(O'Rourke, Philip) |