New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:16-cv-06405
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2016
Terminated:Dec 29, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 4:06 AM EST
Cross Claimant
The Saloon, LLC.
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Shawn Casey
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
45-49 West Central Avenue LLC
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Bridget V. Killen
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
45-49 West Central Avenue LLC
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
XYZ Security Inc.
Cross Defendant
The Saloon, LLC.
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Christopher Moynihan
Cross Defendant
Shawn Casey
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Bridget V. Killen
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
XYZ Security Inc.
Defendant
The Saloon, LLC.
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Moynihan
Defendant
Shawn Casey
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bridget V. Killen
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Defendant
45-49 West Central Avenue LLC
Represented By
Scott Paul Eisenberg
Goldberg Segalla, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy James Celli
Represented By
Steven Bennett Blau
Blau Leonard Law Group
contact info
Shelly A. Leonard
Blau Leonard Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, December 29, 2017
47 47 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Tue 01/02 8:58 AM
STIPULATION + ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above-entitled action against the defendants, be, and the same hereby is, discontinued as against these defendants, with prejudice, as against all parties and without costs to any. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/29/2017) (mro)
Related: [-]
46 46 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/29 9:07 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, With prejudice against the defendant(s) 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC., XYZ Security Inc. and Without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Timothy James Celli.(Blau, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 12/20 9:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Status Conference held on 12/20/2017, ( Telephone Conference set for 1/3/2018 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.). (dh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/05 1:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gina Marie Wischhusen on behalf of 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC.. (Wischhusen, Gina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
minutes Status Conference Mon 11/20 2:49 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Status Conference held on 11/20/2017. A further Conference is scheduled for 12-20-17 at 9:15 a.m. (dh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/20 2:50 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (dh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/01 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore Waclaw Ucinski, III on behalf of 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC.. (Ucinski, Theodore)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 10/05 3:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison: Settlement Conference held on 10/5/2017. The case did not settle. Reference closed. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (mc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
43 43 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/13 11:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court has scheduled a Settlement Conference before the Honorable Paul E. Davison, United States Magistrate Judge, on October 5, 2017 2:30 pm in Courtroom 420. Counsel should have either: full independent settlement authority; principals present; or principals readily available by telephone. Counsel are encouraged, but not required, to submit a confidential, ex parte letter to the Court,not to exceed 5 pages in length, no later than two business days prior to the conference,outlining any information counsel believes would assist the Court in preparation for the conference. Counsel shall notify all other parties of their intention to submit an ex parte letter no later than one week prior to the conference. PLEASE NOTIFY ALL OTHER PARTIES OF THE ABOVE INFORMATION IMMEDIATELY. Any party seeking to reschedule shall telephone chambers with all other parties on the line. So ordered. (Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 420, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison on 9/13/2017) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
42 42 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 09/11 12:15 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement (On or after 10/11/17). Referred to Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 9/11/17) (yv)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Mon 09/11 11:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Status Conference held on 9/11/2017. A further conference is scheduled for 11-20-17 at 2:15 p.m. (dh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 09/11 11:59 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (dh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
41 41 discov Response to Discovery Request Tue 09/05 4:59 PM
RESPONSE to Discovery Request from The Saloon LLC d/b/a The Pearl River Saloon, Shawn Casey, Bridget V. Killen and Saloon LLC d/b/a 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC.Document filed by The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
39 39 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/02 6:59 PM
CALENDAR NOTICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the above-captioned case has been re-scheduled for: Status conference on 6/5/2017 at 2:00 pm, in Courtroom 620, United States Courthouse, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601. Adjourned from 5/31/2017. All requests for adjournments or extensions of time must be in writing and filed on ECF as letter-motions, in accordance with paragraph 1(F) of the Court's Individual Practices. Absent special circumstances, such requests shall be made at least two business days prior to the scheduled appearance. (Status Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 5/2/2017) (ras)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
38 38 misc Certificate of Clerk Fri 03/03 9:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT issued. (mml)
Related: [-]
37 37 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/02 5:31 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:35 Letter filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Fact Discovery deadline extended to 5/8/2017. All other deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Fact Discovery due by 5/8/2017.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/2/2017) (mml)
Related: [-]
36 36 discov Subpoena Issued Thu 03/02 3:27 PM
SUBPOENA ISSUED for Officer Terrence Drain on 4/3/2017 at 1:00 pm.Document filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
35 35 misc Letter Wed 03/01 4:37 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Scott Eisenberg dated March 1, 2017 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2016
34 34 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 12/15 3:45 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott Paul Eisenberg on behalf of 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC.. New Address: Goldberg Segalla LLP, 200 Garden City Plaza, Suite 520, Garden City, New York, USA 11530, 5162819826. (Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 07, 2016
33 33 misc Request to Enter Default Wed 12/07 1:38 PM
REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against CHRISTOPHER MOYNIHAN . Document filed by Timothy James Celli.(Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Certificate of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, December 01, 2016
32 32 cmp Crossclaim Amended Answer to Complaints Thu 12/01 4:36 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to., CROSSCLAIM against Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC., 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen. Document filed by Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC., 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen. (Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
31 31 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/22 3:00 PM
CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 12/22/2016. All Fact Discovery due by 3/22/2017. Non-expert Depositions due by 2/22/2017. All Expert Discovery due by 5/8/2017. Expert Depositions due by 5/8/2017. All Discovery due by 5/22/2017. Estimated length of trial: 7 days. The Magistrate Judge assigned to this case is the Honorable Paul E. Davison. Next Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. ENDORSEMENT: 16. Defendants (except for Moynihan) shall file amended answer by 12/2/16. 17. By 3/1/17, counsel shall submit joint letter regarding efforts to settle the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/22/2016) (lnl)
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 11/22 12:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/22/2016, ( Status Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti.). Order to follow. (kwi)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 11/22 3:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC answer due 12/2/2016; Bridget V. Killen answer due 12/2/2016; Shawn Casey answer due 12/2/2016; Christopher Moynihan answer due 12/2/2016; The Saloon, LLC. answer due 12/2/2016; XYZ Security Inc. answer due 12/2/2016. (lnl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2016
30 30 misc Jury Demand Mon 11/21 3:22 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 03, 2016
29 29 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/03 4:26 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC.(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Thu 11/03 4:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against Christopher Moynihan. Document filed by 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC.(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 21, 2016
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 10/24 9:36 AM
CALENDAR NOTICE: Status Conference set for 11/22/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti Related [+] (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/20/2016) (mml)
Related: [-] scheduled from 11/23/2016 at 09:30 AM.
Tuesday, October 18, 2016
26 26 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 10/19 11:37 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management and Scheduling Conference set for 11/23/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (rj)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 17, 2016
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Mon 10/17 2:18 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff Timothy James Celli on December 22, 2016 at 10 a.m..Document filed by Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/17 2:15 PM
FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Mon 10/17 2:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Christopher Moynihan, XYZ Security Inc.. Document filed by Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC..(Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/11 11:52 AM
NOTICE of STipulation of Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, The Saloon, LLC.. (Eisenberg, Scott)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 10/11 10:00 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Christopher Moynihan served on 9/28/2016, answer due 10/19/2016. Service was accepted by Mike Moynihan. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 10:55 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Bridget V. Killen served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service was accepted by Linda Haubner. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 10:54 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Shawn Casey served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service was accepted by Linda Haubner. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 10:54 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service was accepted by Linda Haubner. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/14 10:53 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. The Saloon, LLC. served on 8/29/2016, answer due 9/19/2016. Service was accepted by Linda Haubner. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/17 11:00 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending9 Complaint against 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, Christopher Moynihan, The Saloon, LLC., XYZ Security Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Timothy James Celli. Related document:9 Complaint filed by Timothy James Celli.(Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/12 12:34 PM
ORDER: The complaint fails to allege the citizenship of defendants Shawn Casey and Bridget V. Killen, because it does not allege the state in which either defendant is domiciled. Additionally, the complaint fails to allege the citizenship of defendants The Saloon, LLC, and 45-49 West Central Avenue, LLC, because it does not allege the identities or citizenship of any of their individual or entry members. By August 19, 2016, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint properly alleging all parties' citizenship. If plaintiff is unable to allege complete diversity truthfully, plaintiff must show cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2016.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 8/12/2016) (rj)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 10:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Moynihan. (vf)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 10:27 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 10:15 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bridget V. Killen. (vf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 10:12 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shawn Casey. (vf)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 08/12 10:09 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Saloon, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 9:54 AM
COMPLAINT against 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V. Killen, Shawn Casey, Christopher Moynihan, The Saloon, LLC., XYZ Security Inc.. Document filed by Timothy James Celli.(Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/12 9:41 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Moynihan, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/12 9:40 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/12 9:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bridget V. Killen, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/12 9:38 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shawn Casey, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/12 9:37 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Saloon LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Timothy James Celli. (Leonard, Shelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2016
3 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS-FILER ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Saloon;Casey;Killen:45-49;Moynihan, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by XYZ Security Inc..(Blau, Steven) Modified on 8/12/2016 (vf).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Casey,
Att: 2 Killen,
Att: 3 45-49,
Att: 4 Moynihan
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Blau, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - COMPLAINT against Shawn Casey, 45-49 West Central Avenue LLC, Bridget V Killen, Christopher Moynihan, The Saloon, LLC, d/b/a The Peal River Saloon, XYZ Security Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12643370)Document filed by Shawn Casey.(Blau, Steven) Modified on 8/12/2016 (vf).
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Fri 08/12 9:45 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Bennett Blau to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 08/12 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Bennett Blau. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains Suspense; County code Rockland. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to White Plains; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 08/12 10:02 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 08/12 10:03 AM
Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 08/12 10:03 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]