North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Loretta C Biggs
Referred: Joe L Webster
Case #: 1:16-cv-01051
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2016
Terminated:May 29, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 08, 2017 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION
Represented By
KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
HEATHER ADAMS
Represented By
KEVIN J. STOOPS
Sommers Schwartz, P. C.
contact info
EDWARD B. DAVIS
Bell, Davis & Pitt, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
DENISE COOK
Represented By
KEVIN J. STOOPS
Sommers Schwartz, P. C.
contact info
EDWARD B. DAVIS
Bell, Davis & Pitt, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
47 47 1 pgs order Judgment Wed 05/29 3:58 PM
JUDGMENT signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 5/29/2019. For the reasons set forth in the Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment; that the parties' Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective/Class Action Settlement and Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards, (ECF Nos.37 ,39 ), are GRANTED. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
46 46 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 05/29 3:56 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 5/29/2019 as set out herein. A Judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Order. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 05/28 10:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS: Fairness Hearing held on 5/28/2019 re37 Joint MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval of Collective/Class Action) filed by DENISE COOK, HEATHER ADAMS,39 MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses and Class Representative Services Awards (Unopposed) filed by DENISE COOK, HEATHER ADAMS. Attorneys Kevin Stoops and Kevin Williams present on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Attorneys Katherine Paulus and Kimberly Lehman present on behalf of the Defendant. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Lori Russell.) (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
45 45 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/23 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS on behalf of Plaintiffs HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHERINE K. PAULUS on behalf of Defendant SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION (PAULUS, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/22 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIMBERLY JOYCE LEHMAN on behalf of Defendant SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION (LEHMAN, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
42 42 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHERINE K. PAULUS on behalf of Defendant SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION (PAULUS, KATHERINE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
utility Motions Submitted Tue 04/23 3:37 PM
Motions Submitted:37 Joint MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval of Collective/Class Action) ,39 MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses and Class Representative Services Awards (Unopposed) , to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2019
41 41 misc Corrected Document Mon 04/22 3:19 PM
Corrected document. (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
40 40 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Mon 04/22 2:47 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK re39 MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses and Class Representative Services Awards (Unopposed) filed by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kevin Stoops
39 39 motion Attorney Fees Mon 04/22 2:46 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses and Class Representative Services Awards (Unopposed) by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2019 (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
38 38 30+ pgs respm Memorandum Mon 04/22 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK re37 Joint MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval of Collective/Class Action) filed by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order,
Att: 2 26 pgs Exhibit B - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 28 pgs Exhibit C - Declaration of K. Stoops,
Att: 4 16 pgs Exhibit D - Declaration of J. Salinas
37 37 2 pgs motion Settlement Mon 04/22 2:40 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (Final Approval of Collective/Class Action) by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2019 (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2019
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 04/15 3:16 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Leave signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/15/2019; that the word limit is extended 750 for a total of 7,000 words. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 04/15 3:14 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Leave signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/15/2019; that the word limit is extended 2,750 for a total of 9,000 words. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2019
34 34 3 pgs motion Leave Fri 04/12 12:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit in Joint Motion for Attorney Fees, Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs motion Leave Fri 04/12 12:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit in Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective/Class Action Settlement by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Submitted Fri 04/12 1:37 PM
Motions Submitted:33 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit in Joint Motion for Final Approval of Collective/Class Action Settlement ,34 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit in Joint Motion for Attorney Fees, Litigation/Settlement Administration Expenses, and Class Representative Service Awards , to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Clarification Tue 04/09 11:24 AM
ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/9/2019; that the motion (ECF No.31 ) is GRANTED and the deadline to file the Joint Final Approval Motion; Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses and Service Awards; and Response to Objection is April 23, 2019. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2019
31 31 5 pgs motion Clarification Mon 04/08 3:33 PM
Joint MOTION for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Extend the Deadline to File The Joint Final Approval Motion by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Submitted Mon 04/08 4:04 PM
Motion Submitted:31 Joint MOTION for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Extend the Deadline to File The Joint Final Approval Motion to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 24, 2019
30 30 27 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Thu 01/24 5:12 PM
ORDER signed by Judge Loretta C. Biggs on 01/24/2018 that the parties' Joint Motion27 is GRANTED. FURTHER that, for settlement purposes only, pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this action is hereby certified as a class action, and the Settlement Class is conditionally certified, under Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and FLSA, as follows All current and former employees of Sitel Operating Corporation (Sitel) who worked as hourly Work@Home agents at any time between February 2, 2013 and June 23, 2017. FURTHER that Kevin J. Stoops of Sommers Schwartz, P.C. is appointed as Class Counsel for the Settlement Class.FURTHER that Heather Adams, Denise Cook, Jonathan Gaffers, Brandi Loding and Tonsania Collins, are appointed as Class Representatives for the Settlement Class. FURTHER that the Settlement Agreement and Release, filed on March 19, 2018, (ECF No. 28-1), is preliminarily approved. FURTHER that the Notice attached to the parties' Joint Motion shall be amended to reflect the changes ordered herein. FURTHER that the Notice, as amended pursuant to this Court's Order, is hereby approved and shall be distributed to the members of the conditionally certified class in accordance with the schedule set forth herein. FURTHER that the Fairness Hearing in this matter shall be held on May 28, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom No. 1 at 251 N. Main Street, Winston-Salem, NC. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/24 5:18 PM
Set Fairness Hearing. Fairness Hearing set for 5/28/2019 at 9:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 04/10 11:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting29 Motion to Stay of the Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. The Initial Pretrial Conference is stayed until further order from the Court. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 4/10/2018. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
utility Motions Referred Fri 04/06 10:46 AM
Motion Referred: RE:29 Joint MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines or, in the Alternative, Approval to Appear Telephonically , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
29 29 motion Stay Thu 04/05 1:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines or, in the Alternative, Approval to Appear Telephonically by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. Response to Motion due by 4/26/2018(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, March 19, 2018
28 28 misc Amended Document - NOT Motion Mon 03/19 2:04 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. Amendment to26 Memorandum,, E .(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement
27 27 motion Settlement Mon 03/19 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (RENEWED) FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK. Response to Motion due by 4/9/2018 (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
26 26 56 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 03/19 12:23 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK re Motions Submitted, (JOINT) OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING filed by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement and Releasae,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Request for Exclusion Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Preliminary Approval Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Kevin Stoops
utility Motions Submitted Mon 03/19 1:45 PM
Motion Submitted:27 Joint MOTION for Settlement (RENEWED) FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Mon 03/12 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/18/2018 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
24 24 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 12/13 4:12 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 12/13/2017; that the parties' Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Collective/Class Action Settlement, Certifying Class for Purpose of Settlement, Directing Notice to the Class, and Scheduling Final Approval Hearing, (ECF No.21 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Sheets, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
23 23 notice Notice - Other Tue 07/25 12:16 PM
NOTICE by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK (Seventh) of Filing Consents to Join Collective Action(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Forms
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
utility Motions Submitted Tue 07/11 1:14 PM
Motions Submitted:21 Joint MOTION for Settlement JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2017
22 22 respm Memorandum Mon 07/10 5:30 PM
MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION re21 Joint MOTION for Settlement JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING filed by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Exhibit Settlement Agreement and Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Request for Exclusion (Opt-Out) Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit Order Granting Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration of Kevin J. Stoops
21 21 motion Settlement Mon 07/10 5:23 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement JOINT MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF COLLECTIVE/CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR PURPOSE OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS, AND SCHEDULING FINAL APPROVAL HEARING by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2017 (JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
utility Motions Referred Fri 07/07 8:13 AM
Motions Referred: RE:20 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION To File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion, until July 10, 2017, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion Fri 07/07 3:03 PM
TEXT ORDER granting20 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The parties shall jointly file their motion for preliminary approval of the settlement no later than July 10, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/7/2017. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
20 20 motion Extension of Time To File Motion Thu 07/06 6:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION To File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion, until July 10, 2017 by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion Wed 07/05 4:04 PM
TEXT ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time To File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. The parties shall jointly file their motion for preliminary approval of the settlement no later than July 6, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/5/2017. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
utility Motions Referred Mon 07/03 9:48 AM
Motions Referred: RE:19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement until 7/6/2017, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
19 19 motion Extension of Time To File Motion Fri 06/30 3:18 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement until 7/6/2017 by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, June 01, 2017
18 18 respoth Consent - Party Plaintiff Thu 06/01 10:01 AM
CONSENT to become a party plaintiff in collective action under Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Denise Dixon Consent
Friday, May 26, 2017
17 17 respoth Consent - Party Plaintiff Fri 05/26 10:55 AM
CONSENT to become a party plaintiff in collective action under Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Barbara Trujillo
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 05/16 12:39 PM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion to Stay the Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. The Initial Pretrial Conference is Stayed pending review of preliminary approval of settlement documentation to be filed with the Court by July 3, 2017. Furthermore, the deadline for the parties' submission of their joint motion to preliminarily approve settlement and related documentation shall be July 3, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/16/2017. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
16 16 motion Stay Mon 05/15 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. Response to Motion due by 6/5/2017(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Order in Gaffers v. Sitel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Mon 05/15 2:23 PM
Motions Referred: RE:16 Joint MOTION to Stay Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
15 15 respoth Consent - Party Plaintiff Thu 04/27 4:30 PM
CONSENT to become a party plaintiff in collective action under Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent of Jacquina Kearse
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 03/21 9:33 AM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines. The Initial Pretrial Conference is continued until May 17, 2017; the deadline for the parties' submission of their Rule 26(f) report(s) is extended up to and including May 15, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/21/2017. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/21 8:22 PM
Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 5/17/2017 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
14 14 motion Continue Mon 03/20 11:36 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Third Joint Motion for Continunace of Initial PreTrial Conference and Related Deadlines
utility Motions Referred Mon 03/20 4:19 PM
Motions Referred: RE:14 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
13 13 respoth Consent - Party Plaintiff Thu 03/02 9:12 AM
CONSENT to become a party plaintiff in collective action under Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Theresa Petty Consent
Thursday, January 05, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time-Other Thu 01/05 8:52 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference until March 22, 2017. The deadline for the parties' submission of their Rule 26(f) report(s) is extended up to and including March 4, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/5/2017. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/05 10:04 AM
Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 3/22/2017 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2017
utility Motions Referred Wed 01/04 9:30 AM
Motions Referred: RE:12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time For Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines , to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2017
12 12 motion Extension of Time-Other Tue 01/03 2:56 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time For Continuance of Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
11 11 notice Notice - Other Tue 11/22 2:19 PM
NOTICE by HEATHER ADAMS Plaintiff's Second Notice of Filing Consent to Join Collective Action(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Wednesday, November 16, 2016
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/16 11:29 AM
Reset Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 1/18/2017 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Kemp, Donita)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2016
utility Motions Referred Mon 11/14 11:54 AM
Motions Referred: RE:10 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Kemp, Donita)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 11/14 4:06 PM
TEXT ORDER granting10 Motion to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference until January 18, 2017. The deadline for the parties' submission of their Rule 26(f) report(s) is extended up to and including Tuesday, January 3, 2017. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/14/2016. (Lee, Pedra)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2016
10 10 motion Continue Fri 11/11 2:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference and Related Deadlines by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
9 9 respoth Consent - Party Plaintiff Tue 11/01 1:35 PM
CONSENT to become a party plaintiff in collective action under Section 16(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act by HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK.(STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit LaTanya Brown Consent,
Att: 2 Exhibit Jermekia Gardner Consent,
Att: 3 Exhibit Zachary Sargent Consent
Wednesday, October 26, 2016
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN J. STOOPS on behalf of Plaintiffs HEATHER ADAMS, DENISE COOK (STOOPS, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
7 7 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Tue 09/27 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/16/2016 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2016
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/23 4:00 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. (JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2016
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/09 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER on behalf of Defendant SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION (JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/09 10:00 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. Answer due by 9/23/2016. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 9/9/2016. (Brubaker, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/08 5:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION.(JOYNER, KEVIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 15, 2016
3 3 notice Notice of Right to Consent Mon 08/15 10:45 AM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties.(Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 08/15 10:44 AM
Summons Issued as to SITEL OPERATING CORPORATION. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 08/15 10:37 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned Mon 08/15 11:13 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2016
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/12 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Sitel Operating Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1967086.), filed by Heather Adams, Denise Cook.(DAVIS, EDWARD)
Related: [-]