Original Case: 3:14-cv-00326

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:16-prici-15442
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2016
Terminated:Apr 17, 2017
Last checked: Thursday Apr 20, 2017 4:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
RICHARD KJELLANDER
Represented By
William Scott Henry
Burke Blue Hutchison Walters & Smith, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
KRESLEY KJELLANDER
Represented By
William Scott Henry
Burke Blue Hutchison Walters & Smith, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Linda Hohlt Wade
Wade Palmer & Shoemaker, PA
contact info
Gregory Mark Shoemaker
Wade Palmer & Shoemaker PA
contact info
Gregory M. Shoemaker
Wade Palmer & Shoemaker, PA
contact info

GPO Apr 17 2017
Opinion issued by court as to Appellants Kresley Kjellander and Richard Kjellander. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 04/20/2017 4:30 AM EDT
Friday, August 12, 2016
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Richard Kjellander on 08/12/2016. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 08/30/2016 as to Appellant Richard Kjellander
Related: [-]