California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Karen E Scott
Case #: 8:16-cv-01520
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 17, 2016
Terminated:Sep 27, 2016
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2017 12:48 AM PST
Defendant
Quint Calvert
Defendant
Does
Defendant
The Calvert Brothers
Plaintiff
Matthew Verdiglione
Represented By
Ross Cornell
Law Offices Of Ross Cornell Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 27, 2016
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 09/27 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2016
10 10 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 08/19 4:17 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation: See document for further information. (lwag)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 08/19 12:03 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. See document for further information. (dv)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 08/19 11:37 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/18 10:26 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Quint Calvert, The Calvert Brothers. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 08/18 10:22 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 08/18 10:22 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2016
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 08/17 3:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 08/17 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione, (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 08/17 3:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 08/17 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18389629 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Matthew Verdiglione. (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Matthew Verdiglione(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)
Related: [-]