The Satanic Temple, et al v. Mike Parson, et al
Original Case: 4:15-cv-00986
Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:16-cv-03387 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 17, 2016 |
Terminated: | Aug 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 29, 2018 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Jeremiah Jay Nixon, Governor of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Chris Koster, Attorney General of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Mike Parson, Governor of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Josh Hawley, Attorney General of the State of Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
The Satanic Temple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mary Doe
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 28 2018
PER CURIAM OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Roger L. Wollman, Michael J. Melloy and Raymond W. Gruender (UNPUBLISHED) [4698516] [16-3387] |
Docket last updated: 08/29/2018 3:31 AM CDT |
Wednesday, August 17, 2016 | ||
Civil case docketed. [4438422] 16-3387 (DMW) | ||
Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 7-15-16. [4438436] 16-3387 (DMW) | ||
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/26/2016. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Mary Doe and The Satanic Temple due 09/26/2016. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4438437] 16-3387 (DMW) |
||
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [4438422] 16-3387 (DMW) | ||
20 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order 7-15-16. [4438436] 16-3387 (DMW) | ||
2
pgs
BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Appendix due on 09/26/2016. BRIEF OF APPELLANT Mary Doe and The Satanic Temple due 09/26/2016. Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4438437] 16-3387 (DMW) |