Roden #319782 v. Slater
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Timothy P Greeley |
Case #: | 2:16-cv-00188 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 18, 2016 |
Terminated: | Dec 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
53 | 53
1
pgs
order
Order Rejecting Pleading
Thu 12/06 8:22 AM
ORDER REJECTING Motion submitted by Johathan Roden ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) |
|
Att: 1 Rejected Document | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 12/06 1:41 PM
Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading53 sent via U.S. Mail to Johnathon Stewart Roden with rejected documents (slk) Modified text on 12/6/2018 (slk) |