SCOTT v Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Andrea M Simonton |
Referred: | Andrea M Simonton |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-23604 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:0416 Denial of Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Aug 22, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Secuirty
|
|
Plaintiff
ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/07 1:45 PM
ORDER on35 Joint Stipulation for Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 5/7/2018. (cmh) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Thu 04/19 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Joint for Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Commissioner of Social Secuirty(Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
order
Judgment
Thu 03/29 7:43 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Eric Leotis Scott against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. Closing Case. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/29/2018. (cmh) |
|
33 | 33
36
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Thu 03/29 7:31 PM
ORDER granting26 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying29 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/29/2018. (cmh) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notification of Ninety Days Expiring
Thu 01/18 2:40 PM
Notification of Ninety Days Expiring by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT re26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT (Robinson, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 04/11 2:51 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. Replies due by 4/18/2017. (Robinson, William) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 04/05 9:13 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Commissioner of Social Secuirty. Replies due by 4/12/2017. (Welch, Alicia) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 04/05 9:12 AM
Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Commissioner of Social Secuirty. Responses due by 4/19/2017 (Welch, Alicia) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 03/02 5:06 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting27 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to respond to26 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment and to file Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including April 5, 2017, to file her Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 3/2/2017. (AMS) |
|
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 03/02 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Commissioner of Social Secuirty. Responses due by 3/16/2017(Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/02 3:57 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. Responses due by 2/16/2017 (Robinson, William) |
|
Thursday, December 08, 2016 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 12/08 3:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion due by 2/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 12/8/2016. (AMS) |
|
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Wed 12/07 9:40 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton for Trial. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned as presider judge in case. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Seitz for Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/6/2016. (pes) Modified text on 12/7/2016 (pes) |
|
Friday, December 02, 2016 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/02 6:41 PM
Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Commissioner of Social Secuirty (Welch, Alicia) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Transcript - Social Security
Fri 12/02 6:39 PM
Social Security Transcripts filed. Transcripts date: 09/14/16. Pages: 1-669(Welch, Alicia) |
|
Att: 1 Transcripts Pages 250-449, | ||
Att: 2 Transcripts Pages 450-669 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 12/02 6:37 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Secuirty. (Welch, Alicia) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Fri 12/02 6:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of Commissioner of Social Secuirty. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party Commissioner of Social Secuirty(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia) |
|
Thursday, October 20, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 10/21 9:40 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. Commissioner of Social Secuirty served on 10/14/2016, answer due 12/13/2016. (jas) |
|
Friday, October 14, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 10/17 8:14 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. Commissioner of Social Secuirty served on 10/11/2016, answer due 12/12/2016. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, October 11, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 10/12 8:07 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. US Attorney served on 10/3/2016, answer due 12/2/2016. (pes) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 09/27 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) attorney general united states by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT re 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, (Robinson, William) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Tue 09/27 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) office of us attorney by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT re 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, (Robinson, William) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Clerk's Notice (Other)
Tue 09/27 2:44 PM
CLERK'S PAPERLESS NOTICE of Compliance re 11 DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Summons and complaint provided to US Marshals' office for service. (pes) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 09/27 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Secuirty, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pes) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Mon 09/26 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT re 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, (Robinson, William) |
|
Tuesday, September 13, 2016 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/13 10:33 AM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting6 Plaitiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This Court notes that, despite the entry of a previous Order, ECF No. 8 , that required Plaintiff to file proposed summonses by September 1, 2016, no summonses appear in the file. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall have until September 27, 2016, to file the appropriate summonses with the Court. When the summonses are filed, they shall be issued by the Clerk of Court and delivered to the U.S. Marshal for service. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action without further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 9/13/2016. (AMS) |
|
Thursday, September 01, 2016 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Thu 09/01 10:19 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re9 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es). Docket Text Does Not Match Document ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (pes) |
|
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Wed 08/31 4:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) CIVIL COVER by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT re 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case,1 Complaint filed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT (Robinson, William) |
|
Friday, August 26, 2016 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Fri 08/26 4:11 PM
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH 5 CLERK'S NOTICE AND RULE 4(i). On or before September 2, 2016, the Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Filing which attaches the Civil Cover Sheet required by S.D.FL. Local Rule 3.3; as well as the proposed summonses required by Fed. R. Civ P. 4(i). Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton on 8/26/2016. (AMS) |
|
Monday, August 22, 2016 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Referring Case to Judge
Tue 08/23 9:12 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton for a determination of all non-dispositive matters and a report and recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/22/2016. (pes) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/22 10:47 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT. (pes) |
|
5 | 5
order
Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE
Mon 08/22 10:46 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pes) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM
Mon 08/22 10:45 AM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (pes) |
|
3 | 3
order
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Mon 08/22 10:45 AM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Assignment
Mon 08/22 10:43 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (pes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/22 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY COMMISSIONER. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by ERIC LEOTIS SCOTT.(Robinson, William) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement |