California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Paul L Abrams
Case #: 2:16-cv-06263
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Aug 22, 2016
Terminated:Sep 10, 2020
Last checked: Saturday Feb 18, 2017 1:18 AM PST
Counter Claimant
H Joseph Nourmand
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Counter Claimant
Doris Moradzadeh
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Counter Claimant
Desert Field LLC
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Counter Defendant
Rossevelt Lofts, Inc.
Defendant
Leon Neman
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
John & Devora Neman Family Trust
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rodney Yashouafar
Represented By
Kevin Matthew Davis
Law Office Of Vahdat & Associate
contact info
Defendant
Raymond Yashouafar
Defendant
Rossevelt Lofts, Inc.
Defendant
H Joseph Nourmand
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Defendant
Yoel Neman
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Neman
1525 South Broadway Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Doris Moradzadeh
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Defendant
Levene Neale Bender Yoo and Brill L.L.P.
Represented By
Joel Alan Osman
Parker Mills LLP
contact info
David B Parker
Parker Mills LLP
contact info
Defendant
Leon & Firoozeh Neman Family Trust
1525 South Broadway Street
Los Angeles, CA 90015
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Paradise Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hudson Labor Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Kevin Matthew Davis
Law Office Of Vahdat & Associate
contact info
Defendant
FNC-OKC II, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
FNC-OKC I, LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Desert Field LLC
Represented By
Maurice Wainer
Snipper Wainer And Markoff
contact info
Defendant
Carla Ridge, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew V Jablon
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Michael E Byerts
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Michael Charles Baum
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Simon Barlava
Represented By
Andrew V Jablon
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Michael E Byerts
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Michael Charles Baum
Resch Polster And Berger LLP
contact info
Movant
Yoel & Monia Nemen Family Trust
Represented By
Jennifer Caroline Shakouri
Allen Matkins
contact info
Marissa M Dennis
Allen Matkins Leck Gamble Mallory And Natsis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard L Abselet
Represented By
Henry Stuart David
The David Firm
contact info
Andrew F Kim
Law Office Of Andrew F Kim
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 10, 2020
516 516 order Dismissing Case Thu 09/10 12:16 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE515 by Judge John F. Walter. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), the action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party will bear its or his own costs, expenses and fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
515 515 stip Dismiss Case Wed 09/09 5:08 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 filed by Plaintiff Howard L Abselet.(Kim, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order on Stipulation for Dismissal of Case With Prejudice