Seay v. Rowland et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 1:16-cv-00068 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 23, 2016 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Feb 19, 2017 3:08 AM CST |
Defendant
John Does I-X
|
|
Defendant
Bucky Rowland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clant M. Seay
Box 2441-Q Old Fort Parkway Box #205
Murfreesboro, TN 37128 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
201 | 201
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 8:33 AM
ORDER: The parties in this case have filed a Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No. 200). Accordingly, the Court recognizes the parties have stipulated to a dismissal of this matter with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/24/2018. (jw) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2019 | ||
200 | 200
6
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/23 2:27 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by Jerry W. Harris. (Miller, Clifton) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2019 | ||
199 | 199
2
pgs
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 04/18 3:12 PM
ORDER of USCA as to193 Notice of Appeal filed by Clant M. Seay. It is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and the appeal is dismissed. (jw) |