Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:14-bk-40987

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Melvin S Hoffman
Case #: 4:16-ap-04080
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2016
Terminated:Oct 08, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sunwind Energy Doyle North LLC
825 E. Main St. Suite B
Boonville, IN 47061
Represented By
Bruce A. Singal
Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sunwind Energy Solutions Doyle North LLC
825 E. Main St. Suite B
Boonville, IN 47061
Represented By
Bruce A. Singal
Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sunwind Energy Solutions LLLP
825 E. Main St. Suite B
Boonville, IN 47061
Represented By
Bruce A. Singal
Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sunwind Energy Group LLLP
825 E. Main St. Suite B
Boonville, IN 47061
Represented By
Bruce A. Singal
Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Top Notch Performers, LLC
5151 Procyon St. #110
Las Vegas, NV 89118
Represented By
Bruce A. Singal
Donoghue, Barrett & Singal, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen B. Darr
Represented By
Charles R. Bennett, Jr.
Murphy & King, Professional Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 10/08 8:09 AM
Disposition of Adversary. Adversary Number 16-04080 Notice of Dimissal filed by Plaintiff. (corozco, usbc)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/08 8:10 AM
Adversary Case 4:16-ap-4080 Closed. (corozco, usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 08/03 1:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/02/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
25 25 notice Notice Tue 08/01 1:23 PM
Notice of Dismissal [of Counts Two and Three of the Complaint] with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, July 31, 2017
24 24 order Order Mon 07/31 1:56 PM
Endorsed Order dated 7/31/2017 Re:23 Status Report. PURSUANT TO THIS STATUS REPORT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE HIS NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHIN 14 DAYS. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
23 23 answer Response Fri 07/28 11:57 AM
Response /Status Report with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr Re:18 Endorsed Order dated 5/3/2017 Re:16 Response filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr. THE TRUSTEE IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE A FURTHER STATUS REPORT IN 90 DAYS. (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2017
22 22 2 pgs misc Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/22 12:14 PM
Notice of Change of Address /Updated Address for Top Notch Performers, LLC filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2017
21 21 crtretm Court Returned Mail and Notice to Debtor Wed 05/17 9:35 AM
BNC Returned Mail Re:17 Judgment and18 Order returned to the Court by USPS as undeliverable. Invalid address for Top Notch Performers, LLC, 5151 Procyon St., #110, Las Vegas, NV 89118-1713. Pursuant to MLBR 2002-4, it is the responsibility of the debtor and/or debtors counsel to maintain the accuracy of the master mailing matrix and any amendments to it. The debtors attorney, or the debtor if pro se, must attempt to correct any incorrect addresses, resend the returned notices and notify the Court as to the address corrections. (jr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
Friday, May 05, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/06 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/06 12:47 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Judgment
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
18 18 order Order Wed 05/03 11:40 AM
Endorsed Order dated 5/3/2017 Re:16 Response filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr. THE TRUSTEE IS HEREBY ORDERED TO FILE A FURTHER STATUS REPORT IN 90 DAYS. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Judgment Wed 05/03 11:38 AM
Judgment dated 5/3/2017 Re:16 Response to Notice of Inactivity and Trustee's Motion for Entry of Judgment on Count One of Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr. See Judgment for Full Text. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
16 16 answer Response Thu 04/27 2:37 PM
Response to Notice of Inactivity and Trustee's Motion for Entry of Judgment on Count One of Complaint with certificate of service filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr Re:14 Notice of Inactivity. Status Report due by 5/12/2017. (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, April 14, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Sat 04/15 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/14/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Inactivity
Wednesday, April 12, 2017
14 14 court Notice of Inactivity Wed 04/12 2:38 PM
Notice of Inactivity. Status Report due by 5/12/2017. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2016
13 13 1 pgs court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 09/29 11:57 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Sunwind Energy Doyle North LLC , Sunwind Energy Group LLLP , Sunwind Energy Solutions Doyle North LLC , Sunwind Energy Solutions LLLP and Top Notch Performers, LLC. (meh, Usbc) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2016 (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2016
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 09/14 2:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Top Notch Performers, LLC 9/9/2016 (Lizotte, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 03, 2016
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/04 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 09/04 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 09/03/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction
Thursday, September 01, 2016
9 9 order Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction Thu 09/01 4:10 PM
Order dated 9/1/2016 Re:2 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for Full Text. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion For Preliminary Injunction Thu 09/01 4:07 PM
Order dated 9/1/2016 Re:2 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr for Preliminary Injunction. HEARING HELD. FOR THE REASONS SET FORTH ON THE RECORD, AND IN THE ABSENCE OF ANY OBJECTION, THE MOTION IS GRANTED. SEE SEPARATE ORDER OF EVEN DATE. (meh, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 27, 2016
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Sun 08/28 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 08/27/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Hearing Scheduled
Thursday, August 25, 2016
6 6 misc Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Thu 08/25 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr (Bennett, Charles)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Att: 2 Notice of Nonevidentiary Hearing
5 5 2 pgs cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/25 3:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sunwind Energy Doyle North LLC 8/24/2016; Sunwind Energy Group LLLP 8/24/2016; Sunwind Energy Solutions Doyle North LLC 8/24/2016; Sunwind Energy Solutions LLLP 8/24/2016 (Bennett, Charles)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Scheduled (Forms Attached) Thu 08/25 8:50 AM
Hearing Scheduled for 9/1/2016 at 3:00 PM at Boston Courtroom 2, 12th Floor, 5 Post Office Square, Boston, MA 02109 Re:2 Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr for Preliminary Injunction. Objections due by 8/31/2016 at 4:30 PM. (ymw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
3 3 2 pgs court Summons Issued Wed 08/24 10:02 AM
Summons Issued on Sunwind Energy Doyle North LLC, Sunwind Energy Group LLLP, Sunwind Energy Solutions Doyle North LLC, Sunwind Energy Solutions LLLP, and Top Notch Performers, LLC. Answer Due for Above Defendants 9/23/2016. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (jlavalley, usbc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2016
2 2 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 08/23 5:02 PM
Expedited Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen B. Darr for Preliminary Injunction with certificate of service. (Bennett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/23 4:56 PM
Adversary case 16-04080 Verified Complaint by Stephen B. Darr against Sunwind Energy Doyle North LLC, Sunwind Energy Solutions Doyle North LLC, Sunwind Energy Solutions LLLP, Sunwind Energy Group LLLP, Top notch perform. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suit(72 (Injunctive relief - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment))(Bennett, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
crditcrd none Tue 08/23 4:57 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 16-04080 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 15749356, amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1