CROSS v. BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Brian R Martinotti |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:16-cv-05147 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Aug 24, 2016 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Feb 20, 2017 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
BAYER AG
|
|
Defendant
BAYER CORPORATION
|
|
Defendant
BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Defendant
BAYER PHARMA AG
|
|
Defendant
JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
|
|
Defendant
JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC
|
|
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
|
|
Defendant
JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC
|
|
Defendant
ORTHO-MCNEIL JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
DEBORAH CROSS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, October 07, 2016 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Fri 10/07 12:45 PM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in U.S. District of Minnesota as case 0:16-cv-03176, filed 10/07/2016. (dm ) |
||
Tuesday, September 20, 2016 | ||
3 | 3
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Tue 09/20 10:14 AM
Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Minnesota. (ek) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Court Transfer
Tue 09/20 10:15 AM
Case extracted via ECF to the District of Minnesota. (ek) |
||
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 08/24 1:08 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 08/24 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against BAYER AG, BAYER CORPORATION, BAYER HEALTHCARE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., BAYER PHARMA AG, JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON AND JOHNSON PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT LLC, ORTHO-MCNEIL JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-7309011) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DEBORAH CROSS.(GROSSMAN, MARC) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 08/24 12:50 PM
Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jjc) |
||
qc
QC - Updating Account
Wed 08/24 1:12 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint submitted by Marc Grossman, Esq. on 8/24/2016 appears to have address information as to Marc Grossman, Esq. that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (jem) |