New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shelley C Chapman
Case #: 1:16-bk-12457
Case Filed:Aug 25, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Oct 03, 2016
Claims Deadline:Dec 08, 2016
Terminated:Mar 22, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
MyPlay Direct, Inc.
33 Irving Place, 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Alan D. Halperin
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
contact info
Julie D. Goldberg
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2017 4:41 PM EST
Creditor
A&E Television Networks, LLC
Vorys, Sater, Seymour and Pease LLP 301 East Fourth Street, Suite 3500
Cincinnati, OH 45201
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Marks
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info
Jeffrey W. Bieszczak
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sony Music Entertainment
301 Route 17 North, 11th Floor
Rutherford, NJ 07070
Represented By
Stephan E. Hornung
Luskin, Stern & Eisler LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MyPlay DIP LLC
Represented By
Keith A. Simon
Latham & Watkins, LLP
contact info
Annemarie V. Reilly
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Sony DADC New Media Solutions Inc; Sony DADC US Inc.; and Sony Global Treasury Services PLC
Represented By
Frank A. Oswald
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Limited Stores, LLC
Cole Schotz P.C. Attn: Michael R. Yellin, Esq. 1325 Avenue of the Americas, 19th Floor
New York, NY 10019
Represented By
Michael R. Yellin
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014
Unknown
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
Represented By
Alan D. Halperin
Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Thursday, March 23, 2017
92 92 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Fri 03/24 12:21 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 03/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #91 )
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 03/22 9:39 AM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
91 91 order Motion, Dismiss Case Tue 03/21 2:59 PM
Order Dismissing the Debtor's Case and Granting Related Relief Related [+] signed on 3/21/2017 (White, Greg)
Related: [-] 73
90 90 order Application, Interim Professional Compensation Tue 03/21 9:48 AM
Order signed on 3/20/2017 Granting First Interim and Final Fee Application of Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP for Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered as Bankruptcy counsel in this Case. Related [+]for Halperin Battaglia Benzija, LLP, fees awarded: $201,430.00, expense awarded: $2,089.70. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-] 68