New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:13-cv-06318
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2013
Terminated:Jan 07, 2014
Last checked: Saturday Jan 24, 2015 12:05 AM EST
Defendant
Tanner Companies LLC
Plaintiff
ENK International LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Marc Purow
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
Steven Stern
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Kaden
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
Jonathan Marc Purow
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Mark Kaden
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
Steven Stern
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, December 23, 2013
4 4 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by ENK International LLC. (Purow, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2013
3 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ("Notice"): Initial Conference set for 1/31/2014 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. -Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/11/2013) (gr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2013
2 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jom)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Tanner Companies LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401076197)Document filed by ENK International LLC.(jom)
Related: [-]
COMPLAINT against Tanner Companies LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401076197)Document filed by ENK International LLC.(jom)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tanner Companies LLC. (jom)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (jom)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (jom)
Related: [-]
Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (jom)
Related: [-]