California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Referred: Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:13-cv-04065
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Property
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2013
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 31, 2014 1:34 AM PST
Defendant
Lyft, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher M. Ahearn
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Alex Santana
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Thomas Michael McInerney
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
James Nebel
Flynn, Delich & Wise LLP 343 Sansome St. Suite 540
San Francisco, CA 94104
Plaintiff
Patrick Cotter
Represented By
Shannon Liss-Riordan
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info
John Earl Duke
Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandra Maciel
Represented By
Matthew David Carlson
Carlson Legal Services
contact info

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
112 112 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 5/29/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/14/15. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
Related: [-]
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 10, 2015
111 111 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Chhabria on 04/10/2015. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2015
110 110 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco. The parties must provide the Court with a conference line and applicable access code to use during the hearing no later than three court days prior to the hearing. Discovery relating to class certification due by 9/24/2015. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Vince Chhabria. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/9/2015. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
109 109 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lyft, Inc. Pursuant to L.R. 3-16 (Amended) (Meny, Rachael) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
Related: [-]