New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Steven C Mannion
Case #: 2:12-cv-07133
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2012
Re-opened:Aug 02, 2013
Terminated:Feb 06, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Mar 12, 2015 5:36 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
MARC ANTONUCCI
Represented By
DANIEL PATRICK MURRAY
O'Kelly Ernst & Bielli LLC
contact info
RYAN MORRIS ERNST
O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
THE PROVIDENT BANK
Represented By
RICHARD M. METH
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Defendant
MARC ANTONUCCI
Represented By
DANIEL PATRICK MURRAY
O'Kelly Ernst & Bielli LLC
contact info
RYAN MORRIS ERNST
O'Kelly Ernst Bielli & Wallen LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
THE PROVIDENT BANK
Represented By
SAMUEL H. ISRAEL
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
RICHARD M. METH
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ROBERT TARABOCCHIA
Terminated: 08/02/2013

GPO Dec 12 2014
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 12/12/14. (gmd, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.