Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:13-cr-00252
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2013
Defendant
ADALBERTO DAVILA
Defendant
ANGEL RODRIGUEZ
Defendant
BRENDA MENDEZ
Defendant
CHAZ LLOYD
Defendant
DAVID ZEDICK
Defendant
EDRED MELENDEZ
Defendant
JASON BEGGARLY
Defendant
JEROME JOHNSON
Defendant
JUSTIN SILVIO
Defendant
KIA JONES
Defendant
LAMAR MILES
Defendant
LEEVAUGHN WALLS
Defendant
LUIS CARDE
Defendant
MICHAEL JONES
Defendant
MIOSOTIS QUINONES-GARCIA
Defendant
NAKEI JACKSON
Defendant
ORLANDO HERNANDEZ
Defendant
RHIONNA RHODES
Defendant
ROBERT RIOS
Defendant
T NOLAN HARDEMAN
Defendant
THOMAS PARKER
Defendant
TOMAS DE JESUS
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Dec 12 2013
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to RHIONNA RHODES re 148 MOTION to Review Detention Order. For the reasons set forth in this opinion, defendant's request for release pending trial is denied. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/12/13. (kjm)
GPO Aug 15 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to MICHAEL JONES setting forth the reasons the motion for release from custody 444 will be denied. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/15/14. (kjm)
GPO Nov 06 2015
OPINION as to CHAZ LLOYD setting forth the reasons 861 will be granted in part and denied in part. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/6/15. (kjm)
GPO Jun 01 2016
OPINION with respect to MICHAEL JONES. For the reasons set forth in this opinion, the court will deny defendant Michael Jones's suppression motion (ECF No. 919) and grant his severance motion. (ECF No. 915.) An appropriate order follows. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/2016. (bgm)
GPO Aug 22 2018
OPINION as to BRENDA MENDEZ setting forth the reasons the motion for minor role reduction 1437 will be DENIED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/22/2018. (kjm)
GPO Oct 11 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to EDRED MELENDEZ setting forth the reasons the motion for court recommendation 1447 will be DENIED. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 10/11/2018. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix: Letter to Warden) (kjm)
GPO Jun 01 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to ADALBERTO DAVILA re 1477 MOTION to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582(c)(2) filed by ADALBERTO DAVILA. Davilas motion for compassionate release 1477 must be DENIED for failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. Davila may later seek compassionate release after he exhausts his remedies with the Bureau of Prisons. Details more fully stated in the opinion. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/1/20. (cjo)
GPO Aug 20 2020
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to LAMAR MILES re 1483 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release for LAMAR MILES (7) Count(s) 1ss filed by LAMAR MILES Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/20/2020. (jt)
GPO Feb 04 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to TOMAS DE JESUS re 1512 MOTION for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release for TOMAS DE JESUS (13). For the reasons set forth in the memorandum opinion 1512 Motion for Early Termination of Supervised Release is denied without prejudice. Details more fully stated in the opinion. An Appropriate order follows. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/4/21. (cjo)
GPO Mar 18 2021
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to MICHAEL JONES denying 1489 MOTION for Release/Reduced Sentence pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act, filed by MICHAEL JONES. Denial is without prejudice and Jones' request may be reconsidered if the circumstances at FCI Morgantown or his family's situation change. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/18/2021. (cw)
GPO Mar 18 2021
ORDER denying 1489 Motion for Release/Reduced Sentence Pursuant to CARES and/or First Step Act as to MICHAEL JONES (16). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 3/18/2021. (cw)
GPO Jul 10 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION as to EDRED MELENDEZ re 1568 MOTION to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment 3582(c)(2) filed by EDRED MELENDEZ. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/9/2024. (lyk)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.