Nevada District Court
Case #: 2:13-cr-00250
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2013
Terminated:Jan 28, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 11, 2024 4:39 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Christopher Burton
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Cristina D Silva
U.S. Attorneys Office
contact info
Andrew W Duncan
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Steven Carr (3)
Terminated: 10/12/2016
Represented By
Raquel Lazo
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Elisa Vasquez
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Brenda Weksler
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Robert Coleman (4)
Terminated: 07/21/2017
Represented By
C. Stanley Hunterton
State Bar Of Nevada
contact info
Jennifer Waldo
Waldo Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
William Congero (2)
Terminated: 01/28/2019
Represented By
Brent D Percival
Brent D. Percival, Esq., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Robert Kane (1)
Terminated: 01/28/2019
Represented By
Thomas F. Pitaro
Pitaro & Fumo, Chtd
contact info
Defendant
Thomas McNamara (6)
Terminated: 07/21/2017
Represented By
Terrence M Jackson
Law Office Of Terrence M. Jackson
contact info
Defendant
Eric Panter (5)
Terminated: 01/28/2019
Represented By
Michael Ryan Pandullo
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/10/2024 5:08 AM PDT
Tuesday, June 25, 2013
Case assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Robert Kane (1) count 1, William Congero (2) count 1, Steven Carr (3) count 1, Robert Coleman (4) count 1, Eric Panter (5) count 1, Thomas McNamara (6) count 1. (SLD)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Robert Kane. (SLD)
Related: [-]
3 3 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to William Congero. (SLD)
Related: [-]
4 4 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Steven Carr. (SLD)
Related: [-]
5 5 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Robert Coleman. (SLD)
Related: [-]
6 6 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Eric Panter. (SLD)
Related: [-]
7 7 AO 257 to1 Indictment as to Thomas McNamara. (SLD)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Grand Jury Return as to Robert Kane, William Congero, Steven Carr, Robert Coleman, Eric Panter, Thomas McNamara held on 6/25/2013 before Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. Crtrm Administrator: Araceli Bareng ; AUSA: Andrew Duncan ; Court Reporter/FTR #: Phyllis Wright ; Time of Hearing: 1:21 PM - 1:22 PM ; Courtroom: 3C ; Warrants to issue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Related: [-]