Florida Northern District Court
Case #: 4:13-cr-00041
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2013
Defendant
AL
Defendant
ALLEN PIERRE COLLIER
Defendant
ALTON EUGENE DIGGS
Defendant
BUD
Defendant
CARMEN DEMARCUS SMITH
Defendant
CHEDRICK CORTEZ JAMES
Defendant
CONRAD DONTAY BURNEY
Defendant
CONRAD WATKINS
Defendant
DADDY MONK
Defendant
DIRTY
Defendant
FUZZY
Defendant
GODFATHER
Defendant
KEITH LAMONT SMITH
Defendant
MARK SMITH
Defendant
NUNC
Defendant
PEDRO ANTWAN BISHOP
Defendant
RED MAN
Defendant
SANCHEZ ANTONIO HUNTER
Defendant
SLATER
Defendant
SPUD
Defendant
SUGAR BEAR
Defendant
THOMAS CONRAD BRITT
Defendant
TRUCK
Defendant
TYRONE RICO MORRIS
Plaintiff
USA

GPO Jan 15 2014
***VACATED PER 307 -- PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to PEDRO ANTWAN BISHOP. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/15/2014. (dlt) Modified on 11/17/2014 (sac).
GPO Jan 28 2014
ORDER DENYING 265 THE MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE SENTENCE as to TYRONE RICO MORRIS (5). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/28/2014. (dlt)
GPO Jan 28 2014
ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO RECONSIDER THE SENTENCE as to ALTON EUGENE DIGGS - The clerk must docket Mr. Diggs's letter as a motion to reconsider the sentence. The motion is DENIED. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 1/28/2014. (dlt)
GPO Feb 12 2018
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to PEDRO ANTWAN BISHOP -- Recommends that: The Motion under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence by a person in Federal Custody (ECF No. 315) should be GRANTED with respect to Ground One of Bishops motion, and that the remaining claims, Grounds Two and Three, should be DISMISSED without prejudice. Bishops criminal judgment should be vacated and the same sentence should be reimposed. Counsel should be appointed for the purpose of appeal (or, at minimum, to consult with Bishop with respect to his desire to appeal). R&R flag set. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/12/2018.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/12/2018. The clerk must send a copy of this report and recommendation to Pedro Bishop at his address of record and to Donna Duncan, who appeared on Bishops behalf at the evidentiary hearing. Ms. Duncan must communicate with Mr. Bishop, and should continue as counsel of record unless relieved of further duties by the Court upon appropriate motion. (Mailed as directed above.) (kdm)
GPO Mar 28 2018
ORDER GRANTING THE § 2255 MOTION IN PART as to PEDRO ANTWAN BISHOP (1) - The § 2255 motion, ECF No. 315, is granted in part and denied without prejudice in part. The original judgment, ECF No. 247, is vacated. An amended judgment is being separately entered. All other claims in the § 2255 motion are denied without prejudice. The clerk must file for the defendant a notice of appeal from the amended judgment. The defendant's appointed attorney Donna Duncan remains the defendant's attorney of record, including for purposes of appeal. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/28/2018. (vkm) Civil Case 4:15-cv-00014-RH-GRJ closed.
GPO Sep 09 2022
ORDER denying 485 Motion for Early Termination of Probation as to ALTON EUGENE DIGGS (2). Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/9/22. (RH)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.