Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:13-bk-12503
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2013
Terminated:May 29, 2014
Plan Confirmed:Nov 06, 2013

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities More than $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
GateHouse Media, Inc.
350 Willowbrook Office Park
Fairport, NY 14450-4222
Represented By
Pauline K. Morgan
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Ryan M. Bartley
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Joel A. Waite
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Debtor
GateHouse Media, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, et al.
350 WillowBrook Office Park
Fairport, NY 14450
Represented By
Pauline K. Morgan
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Patrick A. Jackson
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Ryan M. Bartley
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Joel A. Waite
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Laurel D. Roglen
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 757 Third Ave Third Floor
New York, NY 10017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 14, 2014
257 257 The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/14/2014 to 10/28/2014. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) Modified on 10/14/2014 (GM).
Related: [-]