California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:13-cv-01774
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Oct 01, 2013
Terminated:Jun 10, 2015
Last checked: Friday Jan 23, 2015 2:20 PM PST
Defendant
Eric Campbell
Defendant
Does
Defendant
The Individual Surety Group LLC
Plaintiff
Allen Engineering Contractor Inc
Represented By
Neal Clements
Bruckner Law Firm
contact info
William L Bruckner
Bruckner And Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/04/2013 10:34 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2013
1 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Eric Campbell, Does, The Individual Surety Group LLC. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (Filing fee $ 400.00 paid) Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Allen Engineering Contractor Inc.(adu)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendants Eric Campbell, The Individual Surety Group LLC. (adu)
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Allen Engineering Contractor Inc. (adu)
Related: [-]