Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan Hw Shiff
Case #: 5:13-bk-50484
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Jul 10, 2013
Claims Deadline:Sep 23, 2013
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 08, 2013

Debtor
Sean Dunne
526 Indian Field Road
Greenwich, CT 06830
Represented By
Matthew K. Beatman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Stephen M. Kindseth
Zeisler & Zeisler
contact info
James Berman
Zeisler And Zeisler
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard M. Coan
Coan Lewendon Gulliver & Miltenberger LL 495 Orange Street
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Timothy D. Miltenberger
Coan Lewendon Gulliver & Miltenberger
contact info
Richard M. Coan
Coan Lewendon Gulliver & Miltenberger Ll
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Holley L. Claiborn
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO Jul 18 2013
Memorandum of Decision and Order on Debtor's Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor's Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed on 7/18/2013 (RE: 113 Motion To Stay Pending Appeal filed by Debtor Sean Dunne) (Senteio, Renee)
GPO Nov 25 2015
Memorandum of Decision and Order Granting (RE: 476 Motion for Order Confirming Termination and Inapplicability of Stay or, In the Alternative, for Relief From Stay Filed by Timothy D. Miltenberger on behalf of Richard M. Coan, Trustee). (Burton, Penny)

1. Dunne backs down on bid to withdraw US bankruptcy case (irishtimes.com)
Submitted Thu 11/06/2014
2. Ulster Bank opposes withdrawal of Dunne bankruptcy case in US (irishtimes.com)
Submitted Thu 10/02/2014
3. U.S. Judge Orders Irish Developer to Open Books (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 10/04/2013
Docket last updated: 10/04/2013 5:12 PM EDT
Friday, March 29, 2013
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Missing Document(s): Debtors Declaration page due by 04/12/2012. Statement of Intent due by 4/29/2013. Atty Disclosure Statement Re: 2016(b), Chapter 7 Means Test, Schedule A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statistical Summary of Schedules Summary of Schedules due by 04/12/2013. Filed by Sean Dunne. (Berman, James) Modified on 4/2/2013 to reflect debtor declaration page and statement of intent as missing. (James, Minnie)
Related: [-]
2 2 First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/08/2013 at 10:00 AM at Office of the UST. Objections for Discharge and Reaffirmation Agreements due by 07/08/2013. Financial Management Certificate due from Debtor by 07/08/2013. (Berman, James)
Related: [-]