Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: Jeffrey J Keyes
Case #: 0:13-cv-02798
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2013
Terminated:Jan 07, 2016
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 2:32 PM CDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory J Myers
Lockridge Grindal Nauen Pllp
contact info
Sergio A Tostado
Jones Day
contact info
Michael A Zuckerman
Jones Day
contact info
Adam W Wiers
Jones Day
contact info
Defendant
Datamyx, LLC
Represented By
Albert E Hartmann
Reed Smith
contact info
Gregory T Spalj
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson, PA
contact info
Paul L Ratelle
Fabyanske Westra Hart & Thomson, PA
contact info
Michael C O'Neil
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Terrence K. Montgomery
Represented By
Nicholas R Nowicki
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info
Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Consumer Justice Center P.A.
contact info
Brandon T McDonough
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert N. Broberg, Jr.
Represented By
Nicholas R Nowicki
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info
Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Consumer Justice Center P.A.
contact info
Brandon T McDonough
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Hartford
Terminated: 05/30/2014
Defendant
Northstar Prime Credit Cards
Terminated: 01/28/2014
Defendant
Northstar Location Services LLC.
Terminated: 12/13/2013
Represented By
Michael T Berger
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
National Processing Center
Terminated: 11/14/2013
Defendant
Sherry Moore
Terminated: 07/10/2014
Defendant
Gurstel Law Firm
Terminated: 01/09/2014
Represented By
Spencer J Seamans
contact info
Defendant
Granite Bay Acceptance, Inc.
Terminated: 07/18/2014
Defendant
FIA Card Service
Terminated: 01/09/2014
Defendant
Discover Financial Services LLC.
Terminated: 01/09/2014
Represented By
Aaron Knoll
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Aaron D Van Oort
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Erin L Hoffman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Defendant
Discover Bank
Terminated: 01/09/2014
Represented By
Aaron Knoll
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Aaron D Van Oort
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Erin L Hoffman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Defendant
Capital One Bank USA NA
Terminated: 03/05/2014
Represented By
Aaron Knoll
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Aaron D Van Oort
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Erin L Hoffman
Faegre Baker Daniels LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bank of America
Terminated: 01/09/2014
Plaintiff
Michelle L. Bertsch
Terminated: 10/06/2014
Represented By
Nicholas R Nowicki
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info
Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Consumer Justice Center P.A.
contact info
Brandon T McDonough
Mcdonough & Nowicki PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, January 08, 2016
148 148 2 pgs order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Fri 01/08 4:27 PM
JUDGMENT(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Thursday, January 07, 2016
147 147 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/07 8:53 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 1/6/16. (KMW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2016
146 146 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/05 1:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Datamyx, LLC. Jointly Signed by Terrence K. Montgomery, Robert N. Broberg, Michelle L. Bertsch, and Experian Information Solutions. (Hartmann, Albert)
Related: [-]