New York Southern District Court
Judge:Richard M Berman
Case #: 1:16-cv-06749
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2016
Terminated:Feb 12, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 22, 2017 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
Concordia International Corp.
Defendant
Mark Thompson
Defendant
Adrian de Saldanha
Plaintiff
Chad Stanczyk
Represented By
Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Pomerantz LLP
contact info
Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Pomerantz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2020
8 8 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 02/12 11:54 AM
ORDER: Class Counsel filed a letter on October 16, 2019 informing the Court that the Claims Administrator "transmitted to all Authorized Claimants by check or wire transfer their pro rata shares of the Net Settlement Fund" on October 11, 2019, and "distributed fees and expenses to Settlement Class Counsel as this Court awarded them" on October 15, 2019, as well as the Claims Administrators' fees and expenses, in accordance with the Court's direction to file "a written update as to the status of payments fifty-five (55) days from the date of entry of' the September 10, 2019 order approving the settlement. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to close this case and the consolidated member case 16-CV-6749. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 2/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB (cf)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2019
minutes Fairness Hearing Tue 09/10 2:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Fairness Hearing held on 9/9/2019. Court reporter present. Court will issue order. See transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(Roytenberg, Ariel/CM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/25 12:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Settlement Conference held on 6/25/2019. Also present (on telephone) for part of conference is Mediator Robert Meyer. Parties to make written submissions to Court. If not a joint submission, plaintiff shall file submission by 7/16/19; defense by 7/22/19. Among other things, submission(s) to address authority to approve settlement given current posture of case; legal fees requested; experts retained. Submission(s) to be no more than 15 pages in length and double spaced. See transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (Court Reporter Lisa Fellis) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(CM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 09/04 1:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Scheduling Conference held on 9/4/2018. Motion to amend complaint to be filed 9/25/18; response to be filed by 10/26/18; reply to be filed by 11/5/18. Page limits apply. (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(CM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 05/01 5:37 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox: A Telephone Conference was held on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(Midwood, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Wed 01/24 10:21 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Pre-Motion Conference held on 1/24/2018. Counsel for plaintiffs to provide letter to plaintiffs advising them of proposed procedural plan by 1/29/18 (with copy to defense). Counsel for plaintiffs to file motion by 2/7/18; defense response to be filed by 3/6/18; reply to be filed by 3/13/18. Page limits apply. See transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB-KNF, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(CM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 09/13 9:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/13/2017. Court completes and signs Case Management Plan. (Court Reporter Vincent Bologna) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(CM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 01/19 2:53 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Scheduling Conference held on 1/18/2017. Motion schedule set. Motion by 2/20/17; response by 3/20/17; reply by 4/3/17. Page limits apply. Motion to be decided on papers submitted. See transcript of proceedings held for a complete record. (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB(CM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2016
7 7 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 10/13 9:16 AM
ORDER terminating (10) Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (12) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:16-cv-06467-RMB. Motion Granted. Lead Plaintiff hearing on Nov. 10, 2016 at 11:30. Oct. 24, 2016 conference is vacated. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 10/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-06467-RMB, 1:16-cv-06749-RMB (cf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Consolidation - Member Thu 10/13 9:11 AM
CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:16-cv-06467-RMB. (cf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Tue 09/06 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard M. Berman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2016
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/31 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Chad Stanczyk. (Hood, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/29 11:38 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Concordia International Corp., Mark Thompson, Adrian de Saldanha. (rch)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 08/29 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chad Stanczyk. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (rch)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 08/29 11:36 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of U.S.;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Mon 08/29 11:40 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Richard M. Berman as possibly related to 16-cv-6467. (rch)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/29 11:44 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/29 11:44 AM
Case Designated ECF. (rch)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2016
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/26 3:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Concordia International Corp., Mark Thompson, and Adrian de Saldanha, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Chad Stanczyk. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 08/26 3:44 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 16-cv-06467. Document filed by Chad Stanczyk.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/26 3:43 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/26 3:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Concordia International Corp., Mark Thompson, Adrian de Saldanha. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12696111)Document filed by Chad Stanczyk.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
Related: [-]