New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:16-cv-06752
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2016
Terminated:Sep 22, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 22, 2017 4:38 AM EST
Defendant
Seth Grahame-Smith
11044 Braddock Drive
Culver City, CA 90230
Defendant
Baby Gorilla Inc.
Plaintiff
Hachette Book Group, Inc.
1290 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10104
Represented By
Alexander Gigante
Cowan, Debaets, Abrahams & Sheppard LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 23, 2016
10 10 order Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed Fri 09/23 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Plaintiff, HACHETTE BOOK GROUP, INC., pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, hereby dismisses this action with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. All motions are denied as moot. All conferences are cancelled. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 9/23/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2016
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/22 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Baby Gorilla Inc., Seth Grahame-Smith. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2016
8 8 order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 08/30 4:08 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/30/2016) (tn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2016
7 7 service Summons Issued Mon 08/29 1:12 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baby Gorilla Inc.. (pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 08/29 12:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Seth Grahame-Smith. (rch)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 08/29 12:24 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Gigante. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (rch)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 08/29 1:09 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Gigante. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Baby Gorilla. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 08/29 1:20 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 08/29 1:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. (rch)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 08/29 1:21 PM
Case Designated ECF. (rch)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2016
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/26 4:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Baby Gorilla, Inc. c/o William Harper, Agent for Service of Process, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/26 4:52 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Seth Grahame-Smith, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc.. (Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 08/26 4:50 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Hachette Livre USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Lagardere SCA, Other Affiliate Lagardere Media (formerly Hachette SAS), Other Affiliate Lagardere North America, Inc. for Hachette Book Group, Inc.. Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc..(Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 08/26 4:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/26 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Baby Gorilla, Seth Grahame-Smith. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12696603)Document filed by Hachette Book Group, Inc..(Gigante, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Guaranty,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice